Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469015

EP3469015 - BRANCHED, TERMINATED POLYAMIDE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.10.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AdvanSix Resins & Chemicals LLC
300 Kimball Drive
Suite 101
Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / NELLIAPPAN, Veera
c/o AdvanSix Resins&Chemicals LLC
300 Kimball Drive
Suite 101
Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18718279.527.03.2018
[2019/16]
WO2018US24452
Priority number, dateUS201762481998P05.04.2017         Original published format: US 201762481998 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018187079
Date:11.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469015
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:C08G69/16, C08G69/36
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERZWEIGTE, TERMINIERTE POLYAMIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2019/16]
English:BRANCHED, TERMINATED POLYAMIDE COMPOSITIONS[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE POLYAMIDE RAMIFIÉES À TERMINAISON[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Cited inInternational search[I]  - YAWO-KUO TWU ET AL, "Formulation and optimization of thermoplastic polyamide elastomer properties by mixture response surface methodology", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (20020705), vol. 85, no. 1, doi:10.1002/app.10521, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 9 - 16, XP055481106 [I] 1-20 * figure 3; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.10521
by applicant   - Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, vol. 2, pages 1 - 13
    - Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, vol. 2, pages 518 - 537