Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3399944

EP3399944 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPROVED ACCESS OF PROCEDURAL CATHETER IN TORTUOUS VESSELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.09.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2020New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ram Medical Innovations LLC
326 Braytonburne Drive
Springfield, Ohio 45503 / US
[2018/46]
Inventor(s)01 / SYED, Mubin I.
3108 Henderson Court
Springfield, OH 45503 / US
02 / SHAIKH, Azim
3049 Westminster Drive
Apt. 208
Beavercreek, OH 45431 / US
 [2018/46]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2018/46]
Application number, filing date18725097.208.01.2018
[2018/46]
WO2018US12834
Priority number, dateUS201762467785P06.03.2017         Original published format: US 201762467785 P
[2018/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018164766
Date:13.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3399944
Date:14.11.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2018
[2018/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.09.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/01, A61F2/07, A61F2/82, A61F2/95, A61M25/00, A61M25/01, A61M25/02, A61B17/00
[2019/21]
Former International [2018/46]A61F2/01, A61F2/07, A61F2/82, A61F2/95, A61M25/00, A61M25/01, A61M25/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR VERBESSERTEN ZUGANG EINES PROZEDURALEN KATHETERS IN GEWUNDENEN GEFÄSSEN[2018/46]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPROVED ACCESS OF PROCEDURAL CATHETER IN TORTUOUS VESSELS[2018/46]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UN ACCÈS AMÉLIORÉ D'UN CATHÉTER D'INTERVENTION DANS DES VAISSEAUX SINUEUX[2018/46]
Entry into regional phase30.05.2018National basic fee paid 
30.05.2018Search fee paid 
30.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
30.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
30.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/46]
08.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US2013331921  (ROUBIN GARY [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2, 5 *
International search[XY]US2007030293  (SHIMIZU WATARU [JP]) [X] 1-3, 6-9 * entire document * [Y] 4,5;
 [XY]US2005222488  (CHANG ROBERT T [US], et al) [X] 10, 11, 26 * entire document * [Y] 27;
 [Y]US2016338835  (VAN BLADEL KEVIN [US], et al) [Y] 4, 5 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2015174377  (SYED MUBIN I [US]) [Y] 27 * entire document *;
 [A]US8727988  (FLAHERTY CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * entire document *;
 [A]US8998894  (MAUCH KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * entire document *;
 [A]US2009254116  (ROSENSCHEIN URI [IL], et al) [A] 1-27 * entire document *