EP3623311 - PRODUCTION PROCESS OF A CAPSULATED STOPPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/12] | CAPSULE FOR A FLANGED CORK STOPPER, CAPSULATED STOPPER COMPRISING SAID CAPSULE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE CAPSULATED STOPPER | ||
[2022/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amorim Cork Research, Lda. Rua de Meladas, 380 4535-186 Mozelos VFR / PT | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOS SANTOS RIBEIRO, Ricardo Manuel Correia Rua Manuel Moreira de Barros 621 A133 Afurada 4400-346 Vila Nova de Gaia / PT | 02 /
DE RIBEIRO PONTES, Sarah Lagorsse Rua Jornal de Notícias Nº 796 1º Drt 4100-294 Porto / PT | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Alves Moreira, Pedro RCF Protecting Innovation, S.A. Rua Tomás Ribeiro N° 45 - 2° 1050-225 Lisbon / PT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | Alves Moreira, Pedro RCF Protecting Innovation, S.A. Rua Dom Francisco Manuel de Melo, 15, 3° 1070-085 Lisbon / PT | ||
Former [2020/12] | Alves Moreira, Pedro RCF Protecting Innovation, S.A. Rua do Patrocinio, 94 1399-019 Lisboa / PT | Application number, filing date | 18728465.8 | 09.05.2018 | [2020/12] | WO2018PT50017 | Priority number, date | PT20170110068 | 10.05.2017 Original published format: PT 2017110068 | [2020/12] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018208183 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | PT | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3623311 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3623311 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D39/16, B65D41/28 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
B65D39/16 (EP,US);
B65D39/0058 (PT);
B65D39/0011 (US);
B65D41/28 (EP,US);
B29L2031/56 (US);
B65D2539/003 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 31.10.2019 | TN | 31.10.2019 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GEKAPSELTEN STOPFENS | [2022/44] | English: | PRODUCTION PROCESS OF A CAPSULATED STOPPER | [2022/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN BOUCHON CAPSULÉ | [2022/44] |
Former [2020/12] | KAPSEL FÜR EINEN GEFLANSCHTEN KORKSTOPFEN, GEKAPSELTER STOPFEN MIT DER KAPSEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES GEKAPSELTEN STOPFENS | ||
Former [2020/12] | CAPSULE FOR A FLANGED CORK STOPPER, CAPSULATED STOPPER COMPRISING SAID CAPSULE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE CAPSULATED STOPPER | ||
Former [2020/12] | CAPSULE POUR BOUCHON DE LIÈGE À REBORD, BOUCHON CAPSULÉ COMPRENANT LADITE CAPSULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CE BOUCHON CAPSULÉ | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2019 | Translation filed | 31.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 31.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | IE | 09.05.2023 | LU | 09.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
LU | 09.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
LU | 09.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
LU | 09.05.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR803505 (ARTS PLASTIQUES SOC IND DES) [A] 1-13* figure - *; | [XYI]GB659632 (ISOVAC LTD, et al) [X] 1,3,5,7,10,11,13 * page 1, lines 37-80; figures 2,4 * [Y] 9 [I] 2,4,6-8,12; | [A]EP1772420 (ERICE IRURITA PABLO [ES]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017]; figure 5 *; | [YA]WO2014170286 (OBRIST CLOSURES SWITZERLAND [CH]) [Y] 9 * page 11, lines 6-11 * * page 12, line 13 - page 13, line 20; figures 9-12 * [A] 1-8,10-13 | Examination | US3559834 | WO2006134621 |