Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469166

EP3469166 - WALL CLADDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renson Sunprotection Projects NV
Maalbeekstraat 6
8790 Waregem / BE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HOUFFLYN, John Urbain
Drafstraat 36
8790 Waregem / BE
02 / VANLUCHENE, Kristof
Sparrenstraat 2A
9870 Machelen / BE
03 / DEPRAETERE, Lieven Andr
Walleweg 3
8510 Bellegem / BE
04 / DE FRENE, Joost Benjamin Renaat
Broekstraat 5
8790 Waregem / BE
05 / DELMOTTE, Elien Henriëtte
Burgemeester Mayeurlaan 56
8500 Kortrijk / BE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hostens, Veerle , et al
KOB NV
Patents
President Kennedypark 31 C
8500 Kortrijk / BE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18730866.323.05.2018
[2019/16]
WO2018IB53637
Priority number, dateBE2017000539031.05.2017         Original published format: BE 201705390
[2019/16]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018220480
Date:06.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469166
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018
[2019/16]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3469166
Date:02.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:E04F13/24, E04C2/32, E04B2/96, E04F13/08, E04F13/073, E04B2/74
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WANDVERKLEIDUNG[2019/16]
English:WALL CLADDING[2019/16]
French:REVÊTEMENT MURAL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
10.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2019Fee for grant paid
20.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3032359  (LOOS HERMANN [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 12 - page 14; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US3903671  (CUIN DAVID ERNEST, et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [AD]FR2121393  (PROST GEORGES [FR]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE19620134  (WOLF OTTO DR ING [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE4418291  (HATZLHOFFER SIEGFRIED [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicantFR2121393
 DE19620134
 DE4418291