Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3469166


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.08.2019 (Expected) grant published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.08.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
20.08.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.05.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.05.2019 Change: Validation states published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
03.05.2019 Change - extension states published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
01.03.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
11.01.2019 Change - representative
11.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
17.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
25.06.2018 PCT data prior to European publication