Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3482281

EP3482281 - CONTACT-SENSITIVE CROWN FOR AN ELECTRONIC WATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  31.12.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  04.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2019/20]
Inventor(s)01 / MOUSSETTE, Camille
One Apple Park Way
MS: 87-2PD
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
02 / KERR, Duncan
One Apple Park Way
MS: 302-1ID
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
03 / ELY, Colin M.
One Apple Park Way
MS: 305-1PH
Cupertino California 95014 / US
04 / MORRELL, John B.
One Apple Park Way
MS: 87-2PD
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
 [2019/20]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2019/20]
Application number, filing date18733412.329.05.2018
[2019/20]
WO2018US34946
Priority number, dateUS20171562732119.06.2017         Original published format: US201715627321
[2019/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018236553
Date:27.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3482281
Date:15.05.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018
[2019/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0362, G06F3/0485, G06F1/16
[2019/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KONTAKTEMPFINDLICHE KRONE FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE UHR[2019/20]
English:CONTACT-SENSITIVE CROWN FOR AN ELECTRONIC WATCH[2019/20]
French:REMONTOIR TACTILE POUR MONTRE ÉLECTRONIQUE[2019/20]
Entry into regional phase06.02.2019National basic fee paid 
06.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/20]
06.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2016170598  (ZAMBETTI NICHOLAS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,10,12-17,20 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0099] * * figure - * [I] 3,7,9,11,18,19;
 [XI]US2017090572  (HOLENARSIPUR PRASHANTH S [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,10,11,13-16,20 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] * * figure - * [I] 3,7,9,12,17-19;
 [I]DE102016215087  (APPLE INC [US]) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0060] * * figure - *;
 [A]US2016098016  (ELY COLIN M [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0099] *