blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3567760

EP3567760 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING CROSS-LINK INTERFERENCE, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.02.2022
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/46]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Dongkyu
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / YI, Yunjung
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/46]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/46]Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date18736253.804.01.2018
[2019/46]
WO2018KR00201
Priority number, dateUS201762443773P08.01.2017         Original published format: US 201762443773 P
[2019/46]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018128428
Date:12.07.2018
Language:KO
[2018/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3567760
Date:13.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR12.07.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2020
ClassificationIPC:H04J11/00, H04W56/00
[2020/47]
CPC:
H04W56/0005 (EP); H04J11/0056 (KR); H04B15/00 (US);
H04B17/345 (US); H04J11/00 (EP); H04J11/0053 (KR);
H04W56/003 (EP); H04J2211/005 (KR) (-)
Former IPC [2019/46]H04J11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON QUERVERBINDUNGSSTÖRUNGEN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2019/46]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING CROSS-LINK INTERFERENCE, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR[2019/46]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'INTERFÉRENCE DE LIAISON CROISÉE, ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ[2019/46]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2019Translation filed 
31.07.2019National basic fee paid 
31.07.2019Search fee paid 
31.07.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2019Examination requested  [2019/46]
16.04.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
28.01.2025Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2012178482  (SEO HAN BYUL [KR], et al);
 [YA]US2014160967  (GAO CHUNYAN [CN], et al);
International search[Y]US2010254356  (TYNDERFELDT TOBIAS [SE], et al) [Y] 1, 3-8, 10-14 * See paragraphs [0001], [0003], [0040], [0067]-[0076]; and figures 5a-5b. *;
 [Y]US2013301489  (SIROTKIN ALEXANDER [IL], et al) [Y] 7, 14 * See paragraphs [0046], [0101]-[0105]; claims 1-3: and figure 3. *;
 [A]US2015333877  (RAHMAN IMADUR [SE], et al) [A] 1-14* See paragraphs [0008], [0031], [0044]-[0052]; and figures 1, 6a-6b. *;
 [YA]  - HUAWEI et al., "Discussion on TRP-to-TRP Interference Mitigation Schemes", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #86BIS R1-1608830, Lisbon, Portugal, (20161001), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_86b/Docs/, XP051159157 [Y] 1, 3-8, 10-14 * See pages 1-2; and figures 1-2. * [A] 2, 9
 [Y]  - HUAWEI et al., "Timing Alignment on Cross-link for Flexible Duplex", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #87 Rl -1611227, Reno, USA, (20161105), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_87/Docs/, XP051189799 [Y] 3, 4, 10, 11 * See page 2. *
ExaminationEP3010268
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.