blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3651960

EP3651960 - THERMALLY STABILIZED COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.06.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.04.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.2023Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.07.2023  [2023/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LANXESS Deutschland GmbH
Kennedyplatz 1
50569 Köln / DE
[2020/50]
Former [2020/21]For all designated states
LANXESS Deutschland GmbH
Kennedyplatz 1
50569 Köln / DE
Inventor(s)01 / JOACHIMI, Detlev
Scheiblerstr. 103
47800 Krefeld / DE
02 / LINDER, Thomas
Wichheimer Str. 293
51067 Köln / DE
 [2020/21]
Application number, filing date18738336.912.07.2018
[2020/21]
WO2018EP69000
Priority number, dateEP2017018110513.07.2017         Original published format: EP 17181105
[2020/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019012064
Date:17.01.2019
Language:DE
[2019/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3651960
Date:20.05.2020
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.01.2019
ClassificationIPC:B29C45/00, C08K5/00, C08K5/053, C08K5/13, C08K7/14, C08L77/00, C08L77/06, C08K3/013, B29C49/04
[2020/21]
CPC:
C08L77/06 (EP,KR,US); B29B11/10 (KR); B29C45/0001 (KR);
B29C48/023 (EP,KR); B29C49/04 (EP,KR); C08K3/013 (KR);
C08K5/053 (KR); C08K5/1345 (KR); C08K5/14 (KR);
C08K7/14 (KR); F02B77/11 (KR); B29B9/06 (US);
B29K2077/00 (KR,US); B29K2105/0044 (KR,US); B29L2031/749 (KR,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08L77/06, C08K7/14, C08L77/06, C08K5/053, C08K3/014 (EP);
C08L77/06, C08K7/14, C08L77/06, C08K5/053, C08K5/1345 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/21]
TitleGerman:THERMOSTABILISIERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2020/21]
English:THERMALLY STABILIZED COMPOSITIONS[2020/21]
French:COMPOSITIONS RENDUES STABLES À LA CHALEUR[2020/21]
Entry into regional phase13.02.2020National basic fee paid 
13.02.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.2020Examination requested  [2020/21]
13.02.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.07.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2023Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2023/27]
28.02.2023Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2023/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.202205   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XAY]JPH079945  (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1-8,10-12,14 * paragraph [[0014]] - paragraph [[0019]]; examples 9, 10; table 1 * [A] 15 [Y] 9,13;
 [A]US2008070023  (TOPOULOS GEORGIOS [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph [0003] ** page 6; example 7; table 1 *;
 [YA]US2013217814  (YU TING [CN]) [Y] 9,13 * page 1, paragraph [0001] * * page 5, paragraph [0078] * * page 6, paragraph [0091] * [A] 1-8,10-12,14,15
by applicantDE4236122
 DE102004060009
 DE102006013684
 WO2010014801
 WO2010014791
 WO2011014754
 WO2011014751
 DE102011084519
 WO2013083247
 EP2607419
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 32131-17-2
    - Chemie Ingenieur Technik, Wiley-VCH Verlags GmbH, (20000300), vol. 72, pages 273 - 276
    - G.B. TAYLOR, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19470000), vol. 69, page 635
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 25668-34-2
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 24938-70-3
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 124-09-4
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 23128-74-7
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 126-58-9
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 7440-44-0
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 65997-17-3
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 7631-86-9
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1344-95-2
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 10101-39-0
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 546-93-0
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1332-58-7
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 92704-41-1
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1317-65-3
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1302-76-7
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 14808-60-7
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1318-94-1
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 12251-00-2
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 7727-43-7
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 68476-25-5
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 13983-17-0
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 67479-91-8
    - J. KASTNER, "Quantitative Messung von Faserlängen und - verteilung", faserverstärkten Kunststoffteilen mittels p-Röntgen-Computertomographie, (20070000), vol. 47, pages 1 - 8
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 8002-53-7
    - Plastics Additives Handbook, Hanser- Verlag, (20010000), pages 80 - 84,546-547,688,872-874,938,966
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 14807-96-6
    - The Science and Technology of Small Particles, Micromeritics Instrument Corp
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1309-42-8
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1078142-02-5
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 71449-76-8
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 156024-71-4
    - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 25038-54-4
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.