Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464343

EP3464343 - COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND/OR KITS COMPRISING A RECOMBINANT HUMAN CD38-EXTRACELLULAR DOMAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.02.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HALL, John A.
725 Racquet Club
Rohnert Park, CA 94928 / US
02 / SCHWIND, Peter
Chemin du Calvaire 4
1700 Fribourg / CH
03 / BERRY, Jody
4209 Sullivan Trail
Easton, PA 18040 / US
04 / FAVALORO, Vincenzo
c/o Grifols Diagnostic Solution Inc.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
05 / BOOTH, Elizabeth
1529 Russell Street
Apt. 21
Berkeley, CA 94703 / US
06 / BINDA, Matteo
Chemin de Chanta-Grelet 5
1730 Ecuvillens / CH
 [2019/30]
Former [2019/15]01 / HALL, John A.
725 Racquet Club
Rohnert Park, CA 94928 / US
02 / SCHWIND, Peter
Chemin du Calvaire 4
1700 Fribourg / CH
03 / BERRY, Jody
4209 Sullivan Trail
Easton, PA 18040 / US
04 / FAVALORO, Vincenzo
185 Fair Oaks Street
San Francisco, CA 94110 / US
05 / BOOTH, Elizabeth
1529 Russell Street
Apt. 21
Berkeley, CA 94703 / US
06 / BINDA, Matteo
Chemin de Chanta-Grelet 5
1730 Ecuvillens / CH
Representative(s)Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P.
Còrsega, 329
(Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal)
08037 Barcelona / ES
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18738376.501.06.2018
[2019/15]
WO2018IB53939
Priority number, dateUS201762543788P10.08.2017         Original published format: US 201762543788 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2019030581
Date:14.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464343
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/705, G01N33/68
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND/ODER KITS MIT EINER EXTRAZELLULÄREN DOMÄNE VON REKOMBINANTEM HUMANEM CD38[2019/15]
English:COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND/OR KITS COMPRISING A RECOMBINANT HUMAN CD38-EXTRACELLULAR DOMAIN[2019/15]
French:COMPOSITIONS, PROCÉDÉS ET/OU KITS COMPRENANT UN DOMAINE EXTRACELLULAIRE DE CD38 HUMAIN RECOMBINANT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018National basic fee paid 
27.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
27.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Divisional application(s)EP19184018.0
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2010037837  (MICROMET AG [DE], et al) [X] 24-28,30,33-36,38,40 * page 162 - page 163; sequence 427 * [I] 29,37;
 [X]WO2010037835  (MICROMET AG [DE], et al) [X] 24-28,33-36,40 * page 104, paragraph 3; figure 1 * * page 135, paragraph 2 - page 136, paragraph 1; sequence 229 *;
 [IY]WO2016071355  (GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS SA [CH]) [I] 1-7 * page 45, line 22 - page 46, line 13; sequence 175 * * page 15, paragraph 2; figure 9 * [Y] 8-23;
 [XI]  - A. RADU ARICESCU ET AL, "A time- and cost-efficient system for high-level protein production in mammalian cells", ACTA CRYSTALLOGRAPHICA SECTION D BIOLOGICAL CRYSTALLOGRAPHY, (20061001), vol. 62, no. 10, doi:10.1107/S0907444906029799, ISSN 0907-4449, pages 1243 - 1250, XP055208379 [X] 24,26-28,33-36,40 * abstract * * page 1244, column r, paragraph 2 * [I] 31

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1107/S0907444906029799
    [ ] - RADU A ARICESCU ET AL, "Supplementary information - A time- and cost-efficient system for high-level protein production in mammalian cells", ACTA CRYSTALLOGRAPHICA, SECTION D (BIOLOGICAL CRYSTALLOGRAPHY), (20061001), vol. D62, XP055505535 [ ] * page 3 *
 [X]  - N. D. SALINAS ET AL, "Critical Glycosylated Residues in Exon Three of Erythrocyte Glycophorin A Engage Plasmodium falciparum EBA-175 and Define Receptor Specificity", MBIO, (20140909), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1128/mBio.01606-14, XP055505550 [X] 24,26-28,33-36,40 * page 8, column l, paragraph 2; figure 1A * * page 2 - page 3; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/mBio.01606-14
 [A]  - DAVID N. A. MEKHAIEL ET AL, "Polymeric human Fc-fusion proteins with modified effector functions", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20111019), vol. 1, doi:10.1038/srep00124, XP055063709 [A] 1-23,32,39 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep00124
 [YDA]  - MARLIES OOSTENDORP ET AL, "When blood transfusion medicine becomes complicated due to interference by monoclonal antibody therapy : Transfusion Complicated Due to MoAb Therapy", TRANSFUSION., US, (20150601), vol. 55, no. 6pt2, doi:10.1111/trf.13150, ISSN 0041-1132, pages 1555 - 1562, XP055504695 [YD] 8-23 * abstract * * page 1557, column l, paragraph l * * page 1560, column l, paragraph 3 * [A] 1-7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/trf.13150
 [IY]  - J. DECKERT ET AL, "SAR650984, A Novel Humanized CD38-Targeting Antibody, Demonstrates Potent Antitumor Activity in Models of Multiple Myeloma and Other CD38+ Hematologic Malignancies", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20140901), vol. 20, no. 17, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-14-0695, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 4574 - 4583, XP055239997 [I] 1-7 * page 4576, column r, paragraph 2 * [Y] 8-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-14-0695
 [A]  - IWAO KUKIMOTO ET AL, "Stimulation of ADP-Ribosyl Cyclase Activity of the Cell Surface Antigen CD38 by Zinc Ions Resulting from Inhibition of Its NAD+ Glycohydrolase Activity", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, GB, (19960701), vol. 239, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1432-1033.1996.0177u.x, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 177 - 182, XP055505601 [A] 1 * page 177, column r, paragraph l - page 178, column l, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1996.0177u.x
 [I]  - KHOO K M ET AL, "Expression and purification of the recombinant His-tagged GST-CD38 fusion protein using the baculovirus/insect cell expression system", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICAT, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, (20050401), vol. 40, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.PEP.2004.11.010, ISSN 1046-5928, pages 396 - 403, XP004781392 [I] 1-10 * page 397, column r; figure 1 * * page 401, column r, paragraph l - page 402, column l, line 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pep.2004.11.010
 [IY]  - AKIRA TOHGO ET AL, "Lysine 129 of CD38 (ADP-ribosyl Cyclase/Cyclic ADP-ribose Hydrolase) Participates in the Binding of ATP to Inhibit the Cyclic ADP-ribose Hydrolase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US, (19970214), vol. 272, no. 7, doi:10.1074/jbc.272.7.3879, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 3879 - 3882, XP055515902 [I] 1-7 * page 3879, column r, paragraph 3 * [Y] 8-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.7.3879
 [A]  - SREEJITH RARAN-KURUSSI ET AL, "Positional effects of fusion partners on the yield and solubility of MBP fusion proteins", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION., SAN DIEGO, CA., (20150601), vol. 110, doi:10.1016/j.pep.2015.03.004, ISSN 1046-5928, pages 159 - 164, XP055515913 [A] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pep.2015.03.004
 [AD]  - M. DE WEERS ET AL, "Daratumumab, a Novel Therapeutic Human CD38 Monoclonal Antibody, Induces Killing of Multiple Myeloma and Other Hematological Tumors", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20101227), vol. 186, no. 3, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.1003032, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1840 - 1848, XP055210884 [AD] 1 * page 1842, column r, paragraph 5; figure 2A * * page 1841, column l, paragraph 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1003032
by applicant   - DE WEERS M et al., "Daratumumab, a novel therapeutic human CD38 monoclonal antibody, induces killing of multiple myeloma and other hematological tumors", J Immunol., (20110201), vol. 186, no. 3, doi:doi:10.4049/jimmunol.1003032, pages 1840 - 8, XP055005408

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1003032
    - LOKHORST HM et al., "Targeting CD38 with Daratumumab monotherapy in multiple myeloma", N Engl J Med, (20150924), vol. 373, no. 13, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1506348, pages 1207 - 19, XP055413700

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1506348
    - CHAPUY CI et al., "Resolving the DARA interference with blood compatibility testing", Transfusion, (20150600), vol. 55, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1111/trf.13069, pages 1545 - 54, XP009194358

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/trf.13069
    - OOSTENDORP M et al., "When blood transfusion medicine becomes complicated due to interference by monoclonal antibody therapy", Transfusion, (20150600), vol. 55, no. 6, pages 1555 - 62
    - VAN DE DONK NW et al., "Monoclonal antibodies targeting CD38 in hematological malignancies and beyond", Immunol Rev, (20160300), vol. 270, no. 1, pages 95 - 112
    - CHAPUY C.I. et al., "DARA- DTT Study Group* for the BEST Collaborative. International validation of a dithiothreitol (DTT)-based method to resolve the daratumumab interference with blood compatibility testing", Transfusion, (20161200), vol. 56, no. 12, pages 2964 - 2972
    - BRUZZONE S et al., "Dimeric and tetrameric forms of catalytically active transmembrane CD38 in transfected HeLa cells", FEBS Lett., (19980821), vol. 433, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/S0014-5793(98)00929-6, pages 275 - 8, XP004258393

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(98)00929-6