blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3813754

EP3813754 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING AND/OR VISUALIZING AIRFLOW THROUGH ABSORBENT CORES AND ABSORBENT ARTICLES EXHIBITING ENHANCED AIRFLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.08.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.04.2021
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2024Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.06.2024 [2024/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ontex BV
Genthof 5
9255 Buggenhout / BE
For all designated states
Ontex Group NV
Korte Keppestraat 21
9320 Erembodegem / BE
[2021/18]
Inventor(s)01 / WEBER, Ainas
Himmelsburger Str. 52
53474 Bad Neuenahr-Ahrweiler / DE
 [2021/18]
Representative(s)Macchetta, Andrea
Ontex BV
Korte Keppestraat 21
9320 Erembodegem-Aalst / BE
[N/P]
Former [2021/18]Macchetta, Andrea
Ontex BVBA
Korte Keppestraat 21
9320 Aalst-Erembodegem / BE
Application number, filing date18740126.029.06.2018
[2021/18]
WO2018EP67599
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020001785
Date:02.01.2020
Language:EN
[2020/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3813754
Date:05.05.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.01.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61F13/475, A61F13/49, A61F13/532
[2021/18]
CPC:
A61F13/4756 (EP,US); A61F13/84 (US); A61F13/15203 (US);
A61F13/49001 (EP,US); A61F13/532 (EP,US); G01J5/00 (US);
G06T7/001 (US); A61F2013/15552 (US); A61F2013/8491 (US);
G01J2005/0077 (US); G06T2207/30124 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/18]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG UND/ODER VISUALISIERUNG VON LUFTSTRÖMUNGEN DURCH ABSORBIERENDE KERNE UND ABSORBIERENDE ARTIKEL, DIE EINE ERHÖHTE LUFTSTRÖMUNG AUFWEISEN[2021/18]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING AND/OR VISUALIZING AIRFLOW THROUGH ABSORBENT CORES AND ABSORBENT ARTICLES EXHIBITING ENHANCED AIRFLOW[2021/18]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION ET/OU DE VISUALISATION DE FLUX D'AIR À TRAVERS DES NOYAUX ABSORBANTS ET ARTICLES ABSORBANTS PRÉSENTANT UN FLUX D'AIR AMÉLIORÉ[2021/18]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2021National basic fee paid 
29.01.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2021Examination requested  [2021/18]
29.01.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.06.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.11.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2024Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2024/25]
16.02.2024Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2024/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2014093128  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [XA]WO2016114947  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 10 * page 14, line 8 - page 21, line 25; figure 11E * [A] 1-9,11-15;
 [E]WO2018122117  (ONTEX BVBA [BE], et al) [E] 10 * page 3, line 9 - line 19 * * page 26, line 32 - page 34, line 5; figures 1-14; claims 1-16 *;
 [E]EP3403631  (DRYLOCK TECH NV [BE]) [E] 10 * paragraph [0279] - paragraph [0284]; figures 20A-Z, 21G.T, 21V-Z, 22D-N, 22R-Z, 23A-L; claims 1-15 *
by applicantWO2014093128
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.