Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471971

EP3471971 - IN-SITU POLYMER BLEND FOR A TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.02.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
06.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
06.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trinseo Europe GmbH
Zugerstrasse 231
8810 Horgen / CH
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / EBERT, Helgard
Wittekindstr. 8
06114 Halle / DE
02 / HEIDENREICH, Daniel
Rudolf-Haym-Str. 11
06110 Halle / DE
03 / THIELE, Sven K. H.
Kaeuzchenweg 2
06120 Halle / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18740598.016.07.2018
[2019/17]
WO2018EP69234
Priority number, dateEP2017018349527.07.2017         Original published format: EP 17183495
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2019020419
Date:31.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471971
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2019
[2019/17]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3471971
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60C1/00, C08F2/00, C08F236/10, C08L7/00, C08L9/06
[2019/21]
Former International [2019/17]B60C1/00, C08F2/00, C08F236/10, C08L7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IN-SITU-POLYMERMISCHUNG FÜR EINEN REIFEN[2019/17]
English:IN-SITU POLYMER BLEND FOR A TIRE[2019/17]
French:MÉLANGE POLYMÈRE IN SITU POUR PNEU[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
15.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.2019Fee for grant paid
27.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Cited inInternational search[A]EP3059099  (TRINSEO EUROPE GMBH [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0156] - paragraph [0171] * * paragraph [0177] * * paragraph [0178] *;
 [A]US7321017  (HALASA ADEL FARHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, column 1; example 1 *;
 [A]EP2998362  (JSR CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0083] *
by applicantWO2007047943
 WO2009148932
 US6229036
 US2013131263
 US3281383
 US3244664
 US3692874
 US3978103
 US6777569
 US3078254
 US4616069
 US2005124740
 WO2014040640
 WO2015010710
 US7285605
    - KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chemical technology, Wiley Interscience, (19820000), vol. 20, pages 365 - 468
 TW20140128797