Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3575165

EP3575165 - HYBRID VEHICLE POWER CONTROL METHOD AND POWER CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
[2019/49]
Inventor(s)01 / ENOKIZONO, Yuta
c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
3-1
Shinchi
Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
02 / NISHIMURA, Hirofumi
c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
3-1
Shinchi
Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
03 / GOTO, Tsuyoshi
c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
3-1
Shinchi
Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
04 / FURUSHO, Kentaro
c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
3-1
Shinchi
Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
05 / YAMAMOTO, Wataru
c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
3-1
Shinchi
Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
 [2019/49]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2019/49]
Application number, filing date18756806.823.02.2018
[2019/49]
WO2018JP06669
Priority number, dateJP2017003212423.02.2017         Original published format: JP 2017032124
[2019/49]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018155623
Date:30.08.2018
Language:JA
[2018/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3575165
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.08.2018
ClassificationInternational:B60W10/08, B60K6/48, B60K6/54, B60L11/14, B60W20/17, F02D29/06, F02D45/00
[2019/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR HYBRIDFAHRZEUG[2019/49]
English:HYBRID VEHICLE POWER CONTROL METHOD AND POWER CONTROL DEVICE[2019/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION D'ALIMENTATION DE VÉHICULE HYBRIDE ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION D'ALIMENTATION[2019/49]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2019Translation filed 
29.08.2019National basic fee paid 
29.08.2019Search fee paid 
29.08.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.08.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP2013129260  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-8 * , *;
 [Y]JP2013163436  (DAIMLER AG) [Y] 1-8 * , *
by applicantJP2006187168