EP3591678 - ELECTRETIZED FILM AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-1, Yaesu 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0028 / JP | For all designated states The School Corporation Kansai University 3-3-35 Yamate-cho Suita-shi, Osaka 564-8680 / JP | [2023/18] |
Former [2020/02] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7122 / JP | ||
For all designated states The School Corporation Kansai University 3-3-35 Yamate-cho Suita-shi, Osaka 564-8680 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAJITSU, Yoshiro c/o Faculty of Engineering Science KANSAI UNIVERSITY 3-35 Yamate-cho 3-chome Suita-shi, Osaka 564-8680 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Yuzo c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 03 /
MATAYOSHI, Tomoya c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 04 /
WATANABE, Takayuki c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | 05 /
ERIGUCHI, Michio c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2024/02] |
Former [2020/02] | 01 /
TAJITSU, Yoshiro c/o Faculty of Engineering Science KANSAI UNIVERSITY 3-35 Yamate-cho 3-chome Suita-shi, Osaka 564-8680 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAMURA, Yuzo c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
03 /
MATAYOSHI, Tomoya c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
04 /
WATANABE, Takayuki c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | |||
05 /
ERIGUCHI, Michio c/o Mitsui Chemicals Inc. 580-32 Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/02] | Application number, filing date | 18760815.3 | 01.03.2018 | [2020/02] | WO2018JP07810 | Priority number, date | JP20170041001 | 03.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017041001 | [2020/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018159765 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3591678 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3591678 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01G7/02, C08J5/18, H10N30/857 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
H01G7/021 (EP);
H10N30/857 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP);
H01G7/028 (EP);
B06B1/0292 (US);
C08J2323/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/02] | H01G7/02, C08J5/18, H01L41/193 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISIERTE FOLIE UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/02] | English: | ELECTRETIZED FILM AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2020/02] | French: | FILM CONVERTI EN ÉLECTRET, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2020/02] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2019 | Translation filed | 10.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 15.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008203619 (LANCEROS-MENDEZ SENENTXU [PT], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0003]; claim 10 *; | [Y]US2012177907 (KOIKE HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3 * paragraph [0056] *; | [Y]US2014117272 (YU MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0094] *; | [Y]US2015015120 (KAIMORI SHINGO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 74] , [0 77] , [0078] , [0 82] , [0 86] , [ 117]; figure 4; claims 1, 4, 5; table 2 *; | [A] - SAVIJAIRVI A-M ET AL, "Novel Heat Durable Electromechanical Films: Cellular Film Making From Cyclic Olefien Polymers", ELECTRETS, 2005. ISE-12. 2005 12TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SALVADOR, BAHIA, BRAZIL 11-14 SEPT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050911), doi:10.1109/ISE.2005.1612322, ISBN 978-0-7803-9116-1, pages 75 - 78, XP010905129 [A] 1-12 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISE.2005.1612322 | [A] - WEGENER M ET AL, "Voided Cyclo-Olefin Polymer Films: Ferroelectrets with High Therimal Stability", ELECTRETS, 2005. ISE-12. 2005 12TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SALVADOR, BAHIA, BRAZIL 11-14 SEPT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050911), doi:10.1109/ISE.2005.1612315, ISBN 978-0-7803-9116-1, pages 47 - 50, XP010905122 [A] 1-12 * page 47; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISE.2005.1612315 | International search | [A]JP2002505034 [A] 1-12* , *; | [A]JP2011086924 (YUPO CORP) [A] 1-12 * , *; | [A]JP2014141651 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * , * | Examination | - BEHRENDT N ET AL, "Development of porous polypropylene blends with NA11 particles and glass hollow spheres by biaxial stretching for electret applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON DIELECTRICS AND ELECTRICAL INSULATION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20061001), vol. 13, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TDEI.2006.247824, ISSN 1070-9878, pages 992 - 1000, XP008153877 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TDEI.2006.247824 | - NICO BEHRENDT, "Tailored processing methods for cellular polycarbonate and polyetherimide films - new potentials for electret and piezoelectric applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON DIELECTRICS AND ELECTRICAL INSULATION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20100801), vol. 17, no. 4, ISSN 1070-9878, pages 1113 - 1122, XP011316153 | by applicant | JP2005343148 | WO2008047468 | JP2011084735 | JP2012122041 | JP2017041001 |