Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471320

EP3471320 - METHOD FOR RECEIVING OR TRANSMITTING DOWNLINK SIGNAL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / YUM, Kunil
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / KANG, Jiwon
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / PARK, Jonghyun
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
04 / KIM, Hyungtae
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18763060.306.03.2018
[2019/16]
WO2018KR02646
Priority number, dateUS201762467248P06.03.2017         Original published format: US 201762467248 P
US201762490602P27.04.2017         Original published format: US 201762490602 P
US201762519877P15.06.2017         Original published format: US 201762519877 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018164452
Date:13.09.2018
Language:KO
[2018/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471320
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR13.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00, H04L1/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANGEN ODER SENDEN VON DOWNLINK-SIGNALEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR RECEIVING OR TRANSMITTING DOWNLINK SIGNAL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR SAME[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION OU DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL DESCENDANT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019Translation filed 
09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Cited inInternational search[Y]KR20160013871  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1, 2, 4-9, 11-15 * See paragraphs [0166]-[0227]; and figure 25. *;
 [Y]US2014073336  (KANG SEUNG HYUN [KR]) [Y] 2, 9 * See paragraphs [0049]-[0069]; and figures 4-5. *;
 [Y]EP2852072  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [Y] 5, 6, 12, 13 * See paragraphs [0011], [0030]-[0054]; and figure 1. *;
 [A]US2015312927  (KO YOUNG JO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0090]-[0143], and figure 5. *
 [YA]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on CSI Framework for NR", R1-1702455, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #88, (20170207), XP051209609 [Y] 1, 2, 4-9, 11-15 * See pages 1-6. * [A] 3, 10