Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468251

EP3468251 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA IN CU-DU SPLIT SCENARIO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / BYUN, Daewook
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / XU, Jian
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / LEE, Jaewook
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
04 / KIM, Seokjung
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18763493.607.03.2018
[2019/15]
WO2018KR02680
Priority number, dateUS201762467830P07.03.2017         Original published format: US 201762467830 P
US201762475227P23.03.2017         Original published format: US 201762475227 P
US201762488076P21.04.2017         Original published format: US 201762488076 P
US201762536468P25.07.2017         Original published format: US 201762536468 P
US201762555050P07.09.2017         Original published format: US 201762555050 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018164469
Date:13.09.2018
Language:KO
[2018/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468251
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR13.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/02, H04W36/08, H04W24/10, H04W88/08
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN IN EINEM GETEILTEN CU-DU-SZENARIO[2019/15]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA IN CU-DU SPLIT SCENARIO[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES DANS UN SCÉNARIO DE PARTAGE CU-DU[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019Translation filed 
07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
Cited inInternational search[YA]WO2015105389  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-2, 11-12, 14-15 * See paragraphs [0058]-[0059]. * [A] 3-10, 13;
 [Y]US2014378114  (LIM HAN NA [KR], et al) [Y] 11-12 * See paragraphs [0231], [0250]; and figure 9. *;
 [A]KR20160126830  (KT CORP [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0047]; and figure 1. *
 [Y]  - ZTE, "Further Consideration on New RAN Aggregation Scenarios Due to CUDU Split", R3-162705, 3GPP TSG RAN WG3 Meeting #94, Reno, USA, (20161118), XP051178811 [Y] 1-2, 11-12, 14-15 * See sections 1-2; and figure 2. *
 [A]  - SAMSUNG, "Grouping of NR User Plane Functions and Placements in CUDU Split", R2-166506, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 Meeting #95bis, Kaohsiung, Taiwan, (20160930), XP051161744 [A] 1-15 * See sections I, 2.3. *