Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471322

EP3471322 - UPLINK SIGNAL TRANSMISSION OR RECEPTION METHOD FOR TERMINAL SUPPORTING PLURALITY OF TRANSMISSION TIME INTERVALS, PLURALITY OF SUB-CARRIER INTERVALS, OR PLURALITY OF PROCESSING TIMES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2020Supplementary search reportpublished on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Hyunho
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / HWANG, Daesung
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / YI, Yunjung
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18771839.009.03.2018
[2019/16]
WO2018KR02837
Priority number, dateUS201762475853P23.03.2017         Original published format: US 201762475853 P
US201762492096P28.04.2017         Original published format: US 201762492096 P
US201762543382P10.08.2017         Original published format: US 201762543382 P
US201762557111P11.09.2017         Original published format: US 201762557111 P
US201762574133P18.10.2017         Original published format: US 201762574133 P
US201762580965P02.11.2017         Original published format: US 201762580965 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018174450
Date:27.09.2018
Language:KO
[2018/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471322
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.09.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2020
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00, H04L5/02, H04L1/16, H04L1/18
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:UPLINK-SIGNAL-ÜBERTRAGUNGS- ODER -EMPFANGSVERFAHREN FÜR ENDGERÄTE, DIE MEHRERE ÜBERTRAGUNGSZEITINTERVALLE, MEHRERE UNTERTRÄGERINTERVALLE ODER MEHRERE VERARBEITUNGSZEITEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UNTERSTÜTZEN, UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2019/16]
English:UPLINK SIGNAL TRANSMISSION OR RECEPTION METHOD FOR TERMINAL SUPPORTING PLURALITY OF TRANSMISSION TIME INTERVALS, PLURALITY OF SUB-CARRIER INTERVALS, OR PLURALITY OF PROCESSING TIMES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND DEVICE THEREFOR[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION OU DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL DE LIAISON MONTANTE POUR TERMINAL PRENANT EN CHARGE UNE PLURALITÉ D'INTERVALLES DE TEMPS DE TRANSMISSION, UNE PLURALITÉ D'INTERVALLES DE SOUS-PORTEUSE, OU UNE PLURALITÉ DE TEMPS DE TRAITEMENT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019Translation filed 
08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Search fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
08.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Cited inInternational search[XYA]  - PANASONIC, "UL Simultaneous Transmission between sTTI and TTI", R1-1612108, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #87, Reno, USA, (20161104), XP051189180 [X] 1, 2, 9, 10, 17 * See section 2. * [Y] 8, 16 [A] 3-7, 11-15
 [Y]  - "Scheduling Request Design for NR", R1-1700370, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 NR Ad-Hoc Meeting, Spokane, USA, (20170110), XP051202848 [Y] 8, 16 * See section 3. *
 [A]  - "Discussion on Uplink Control Channel for NR", R1-1700543, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 NR Ad-Hoc Meeting, Spokane, USA, (20170125), XP051222548 [A] 1-17 * See sections 1-2.3. *
 [A]  - HUAWEI et al., "Discussion on SR for Shortened TTI", R1 -1703070, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #88, Athens, Greece, (20170206), XP051210208 [A] 1-17 * See sections 1-2.2. *
 [A]  - HUAWEI et al., "SR and BSR Procedure in Short TTI", R2-1701887, 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 Meeting #97, Athens, Greece, (20170204), XP051223766 [A] 1-17 * See sections 1-2.2. *