Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471323

EP3471323 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING OR RECEIVING SIGNAL BETWEEN TERMINAL AND BASE STATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND DEVICE SUPPORTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Hanjun
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / PARK, Changhwan
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / YANG, Suckchel
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
04 / KIM, Seonwook
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18772023.023.03.2018
[2019/16]
WO2018KR03431
Priority number, dateUS201762475839P23.03.2017         Original published format: US 201762475839 P
US201762480550P03.04.2017         Original published format: US 201762480550 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2018174633
Date:27.09.2018
Language:KO
[2018/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3471323
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.11.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00, H04L25/02, H04B7/0456
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN ODER EMPFANGEN VON SIGNALEN ZWISCHEN EINEM ENDGERÄT UND EINER BASISSTATION IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DAVON[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING OR RECEIVING SIGNAL BETWEEN TERMINAL AND BASE STATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND DEVICE SUPPORTING SAME[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION OU DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL ENTRE UN TERMINAL ET UNE STATION DE BASE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET DISPOSITIF LE PRENANT EN CHARGE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019Translation filed 
10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
13.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Cited inInternational search[XY]KR20160097133  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-2, 6, 8 * See paragraphs [0027], [0055]-[0056], [0189]; and figure 4. * [Y] 3-5, 7, 9;
 [Y]KR20110048405  (PANTECH CO., LTD.) [Y] 3-5 * See paragraph [0011]; and figure 7a. *;
 [Y]KR101055060B  (FUJITSU LIMITED) [Y] 7, 9 * See paragraphs [0100]-[0102], [0139]; and claim 1. *;
 [A]  - "Considerations on sPUSCH Design", R1-1702657, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #88, Athens, Greece, (20170207), XP051209804 [A] 1-9 * See section 2; and figures 1-2. *
 [A]  - II TH et al., "Pre-DFT Multiplexing of RS and Data: Results on Short Duration One OFDM Symbol Uplink", R1-1701913, 3GPP TSG RAN WGI Meeting #88, Athens, Greece, (20170205), XP051209075 [A] 1-9 * See section 2; and figure 1. *