EP3604806 - CAPACITY CONTROL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [2022/21] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURIHARA, Daichi c/o Eagle Industry Co. Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 02 /
FUKUDOME, Kohei c/o Eagle Industry Co. Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 03 /
HAYAMA, Masahiro c/o Eagle Industry Co. Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 04 /
SHIRAFUJI, Keigo c/o Eagle Industry Co. Ltd. 1-12-15 Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18777278.5 | 20.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP11063 | Priority number, date | JP20170062552 | 28.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017062552 | JP20170086958 | 26.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017086958 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018180784 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604806 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3604806 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/18, F04B27/10, F04B49/22, F04B53/10 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
F04B27/1804 (EP,US);
F04B27/18 (KR);
F04B27/10 (EP);
F04B49/22 (EP,US);
F04B53/1082 (EP);
F04B53/1087 (EP);
F16K1/36 (KR);
F16K1/42 (KR,US);
F16K31/06 (KR,US);
F04B2027/1813 (EP,US);
F04B2027/1827 (EP,US);
F04B2027/1831 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | F04B27/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTIL ZUR KAPAZITÄTSSTEUERUNG | [2020/06] | English: | CAPACITY CONTROL VALVE | [2020/06] | French: | SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE DE CAPACITÉ | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2019 | Translation filed | 21.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 21.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.05.2022 | AT | 25.05.2022 | BG | 25.05.2022 | CZ | 25.05.2022 | DK | 25.05.2022 | EE | 25.05.2022 | ES | 25.05.2022 | FI | 25.05.2022 | HR | 25.05.2022 | IT | 25.05.2022 | LT | 25.05.2022 | LV | 25.05.2022 | MC | 25.05.2022 | NL | 25.05.2022 | PL | 25.05.2022 | RO | 25.05.2022 | RS | 25.05.2022 | SE | 25.05.2022 | SI | 25.05.2022 | SK | 25.05.2022 | SM | 25.05.2022 | NO | 25.08.2022 | GR | 26.08.2022 | IS | 25.09.2022 | PT | 26.09.2022 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
IT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1279831 (TGK CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0063] *; | [A]EP1333177 (EAGLE IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0136] *; | [A]EP1462650 (TGK CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0040] *; | [XI]EP1582742 (FUJIKOKI CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0054] * [I] 5,6,9; | [A]EP1895162 (EAGLE IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-6 ** paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0040] *; | [A]EP2090779 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0055] *; | [A]EP2857681 (EAGLE IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0046] * | International search | [A]JPH1162825 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings & US 6443707 B1 & WO 2000/050775 A1 & EP 1081379 A1 *; | [A]JP2001132632 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS, et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings & US 6354811 B1 & EP 1099852 A2 *; | [A]JP2004116349 (TGK CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2004/0057840 A1 & EP 1403516 A2 *; | [XA]JP2004293497 (TGK CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0026]-[0041], fig. 4-6 & US 2004/0191078 A1, paragraphs [0036]-[0051], fig. 4-6 & EP 1462650 A2 * [A] 8-9; | [A]JP2005120972 (ZEXEL VALEO CLIMATE CONTR CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]US2014248163 (LEE YONG JU [KR], et al) [A] 1-9* , entire text, all drawings & WO 2012/161514 A2 & CN 103547804 A * | Examination | EP1333177 | EP1279831 | by applicant | JP5167121B |