blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3604755

EP3604755 - REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.02.2020
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2020Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.04.2020  [2020/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hino Motors, Ltd.
3-1-1, Hinodai
Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8660 / JP
[2020/06]
Inventor(s)01 / TOMITA, Noriyuki
c/o HINO MOTORS LTD.
1-1 Hinodai 3-chome
Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8660 / JP
02 / TONGU, Hirofumi
c/o HINO MOTORS LTD.
1-1 Hinodai 3-chome
Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8660 / JP
03 / TSURUTA, Tomoyuki
c/o HINO HUTECH CO. LTD.
9-5 Hinodai 1-chome
Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0003 / JP
 [2020/06]
Representative(s)Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
[2020/06]
Application number, filing date18777818.813.03.2018
[2020/06]
WO2018JP09690
Priority number, dateJP2017007091931.03.2017         Original published format: JP 2017070919
[2020/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018180457
Date:04.10.2018
Language:JA
[2018/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3604755
Date:05.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.10.2018
ClassificationIPC:F01N3/24
[2020/06]
CPC:
F01N3/2066 (EP,US); B01F23/2132 (EP); B01F25/3131 (EP);
B01F25/4315 (EP); F01N3/2892 (EP,US); B01D2251/2067 (US);
B01D53/9431 (US); F01N2240/20 (US); F01N2570/14 (US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US); F01N2610/1453 (EP); Y02T10/12 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REAKTOR[2020/06]
English:REACTOR[2020/06]
French:RÉACTEUR[2020/06]
Entry into regional phase01.10.2019Translation filed 
01.10.2019National basic fee paid 
01.10.2019Search fee paid 
01.10.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2019Examination requested  [2020/06]
21.02.2020Application withdrawn by applicant  [2020/14]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]JP2008280999  (BOYSEN FRIEDRICH GMBH CO KG, et al) [Y] 3 * , fig. 1-5 & US 2008/0295497 A1, fig. 1-5 & EP 1990513 A1 & DE 102007021598 A1 & CN 101302957 A & CN 102003252 A *;
 [Y]JP2015527527  (TENNECO AUTOMOTIVE OPERATING COMPANY INC.) [Y] 1-3 * , fig. 22-28 & JP 2016-194302 A & US 2013/0188444 A1, fig. 22-28 & US 2009/0262599 A1 & US 9095827 B2 & US 2014/0321233 A1 & US 2015/0314250 A1 & WO 2014/025538 A1 & WO 2015/080917 A1 & DE 102008028616 A1 & DE 102008028626 A1 & DE 102008028627 A1 & DE 102008028625 A1 & CN 1045205 A *;
 [Y]JP2015218687  (HINO MOTORS LTD) [Y] 1-3 * , fig. 1-3 & US 2017/0044957 A1, fig. 3, 4 & WO 2015/178231 A1 & EP 3168440 A1 *;
 [A]JP2017036682  (HINO MOTORS LTD, et al) [A] 1-3* , fig. 1-7 (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2015218687
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.