blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3617988

EP3617988 - SOLID-STATE IMAGING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SOLID-STATE IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.01.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Semiconductor Solutions Corporation
4-14-1, Asahi-cho
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP
[2020/10]
Inventor(s)01 / HIRONO, Ryo
c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION
4-14-1 Asahi-cho
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP
02 / SAITO, Yasushi
c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION
4-14-1 Asahi-cho
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP
03 / TAKEDA, Tomoya
c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION
4-14-1 Asahi-cho
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP
04 / ONO, Hiroaki
c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION
4-14-1 Asahi-cho
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP
 [2020/10]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Straße 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2020/10]Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date18792131.703.04.2018
[2020/10]
WO2018JP14212
Priority number, dateJP2017008864927.04.2017         Original published format: JP 2017088649
[2020/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018198690
Date:01.11.2018
Language:JA
[2018/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3617988
Date:04.03.2020
Language:EN
[2020/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.11.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:G06T1/00, G06F21/32, G06T7/00, H01L27/146, H04N5/232, H04N5/235, H04N5/369, G06K9/00
[2020/22]
CPC:
H01L27/14634 (EP); H04N25/77 (US); G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (EP); G06T7/00 (EP); G06V40/19 (EP);
H01L27/14636 (EP); H02S50/15 (EP); H04N23/60 (EP);
H04N23/611 (US); H04N23/70 (EP); H04N25/44 (US);
H04N25/58 (US); H04N25/70 (EP); H04N25/704 (US);
Y02E10/50 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/10]G06T1/00, G06F21/32, G06T7/00, H01L27/146, H04N5/232, H04N5/235, H04N5/369
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/10]
TitleGerman:FESTKÖRPERBILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER FESTKÖRPERBILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2020/10]
English:SOLID-STATE IMAGING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SOLID-STATE IMAGING DEVICE[2020/10]
French:DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS[2020/10]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2019Translation filed 
13.09.2019National basic fee paid 
13.09.2019Search fee paid 
13.09.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2019Examination requested  [2020/10]
24.11.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.06.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2022Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
22.12.2022Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
05.03.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
20.04.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
18.04.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2005244356  (SONY CORP) [Y] 7,8 * abstract *;
 [Y]JP2007093874  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0038] *;
 [XYI]JP2009205576  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6,14 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] * [Y] 3,7-13 [I] 5;
 [X]WO2015127313  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,14 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0036] , [0038] ** paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] *;
 [Y]WO2016185901  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 9-13 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0036] , [0048] , [0110] , [0301]; claim 1 *
International search[Y]JP2005244356  (SONY CORP) [Y] 7-8 * , abstract & US 2006/0233357 A1, abstract & EP 1608101 A1 & CN 1778064 A & KR 10-1101289 B1 & TW 200539604 A *;
 [Y]JP2007093874  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 3 * , paragraphs [0001]-[0002], [0038] (Family: none) *;
 [XY]JP2009205576  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-2, 4-6, 14 * , paragraphs [0027]-[0031] (Family: none) * [Y] 3, 7-13;
 [Y]WO2016185901  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 9-13* claim 1, paragraphs [0024]-[0025], [0036], [0048], [0110], [0301] & CN 107534047 A & KR 10-2018-0008394 A & TW 201640664 A *
by applicantJP2015170099
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.