blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3707390

EP3707390 - HYDRAULIC CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.04.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.02.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.08.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.05.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société Industrielle de Sonceboz S.A.
5, rue Rosselet-Challandes
2605 Sonceboz / CH
[2020/38]
Inventor(s)01 / NIKLAUS, Joël
Route du Büttenberg 16
2504 Bienne / CH
02 / BILLET, Lionel
31 rue du Cras
25410 Dannemarie sur Crète / FR
03 / BOIVIN, Fabrice
7 rue de la Sapinière
25500 Les Fins / FR
 [2020/38]
Representative(s)reuteler & cie SA
Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29
1260 Nyon / CH
[2020/38]
Application number, filing date18793223.101.11.2018
[2020/38]
WO2018EP79913
Priority number, dateEP2017020121010.11.2017         Original published format: EP 17201210
[2020/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019091852
Date:16.05.2019
Language:FR
[2019/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3707390
Date:16.09.2020
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3707390
Date:01.06.2022
Language:FR
[2022/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:F15B13/044, H02K21/14, H02K1/14, H02K11/33
[2020/38]
CPC:
F15B13/0444 (EP,US); F16K31/047 (EP); F16K31/54 (EP,US);
H02K1/14 (EP,US); H02K11/215 (EP,US); H02K11/33 (EP,US);
H02K21/14 (EP); H02K7/116 (EP); F15B13/0839 (EP);
F15B13/0846 (EP); F15B13/0853 (EP); F15B13/0857 (EP);
F15B13/086 (EP); F15B2013/0409 (EP); F15B2211/6656 (EP);
H02K2201/15 (EP); H02K2211/03 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HYDRAULISCHE STEUERUNG[2020/38]
English:HYDRAULIC CONTROL[2020/38]
French:COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE[2020/38]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2020National basic fee paid 
11.05.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2020Examination requested  [2020/38]
11.05.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.12.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2022Fee for grant paid
19.04.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.04.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.02.2023  03.03.2023  ADMISSIBLE
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
 [2023/15]
Former [2023/14]
Opponent(s)01  28.02.2023   
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
16.03.2023Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.07.2023Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.10.2024Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.11.2018
AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CY01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
IT01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
GB01.11.2022
IE01.11.2022
LU01.11.2022
BE30.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
[2024/24]
Former [2024/21]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CY01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
IT01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
GB01.11.2022
IE01.11.2022
LU01.11.2022
BE30.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2024/11]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
IT01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
GB01.11.2022
IE01.11.2022
LU01.11.2022
BE30.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/49]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
GB01.11.2022
IE01.11.2022
LU01.11.2022
BE30.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/48]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
GB01.11.2022
IE01.11.2022
LU01.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/47]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
GB01.11.2022
LU01.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/37]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
LU01.11.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/35]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
CH30.11.2022
LI30.11.2022
Former [2023/31]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
MC01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/25]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SI01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/21]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
DK01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/17]AL01.06.2022
AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/12]AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
IS01.10.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/09]AT01.06.2022
CZ01.06.2022
EE01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RO01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
SK01.06.2022
SM01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
PT03.10.2022
Former [2023/07]AT01.06.2022
ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
Former [2023/02]ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
NL01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
Former [2022/50]ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
PL01.06.2022
RS01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
Former [2022/49]ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
HR01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
LV01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
BG01.09.2022
NO01.09.2022
GR02.09.2022
Former [2022/47]ES01.06.2022
FI01.06.2022
LT01.06.2022
SE01.06.2022
NO01.09.2022
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2382124  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0949747  (SONCEBOZ S A [CH]) [Y] 13,14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE102007031429  (THOMAS MAGNETE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]FR2919441  (MOVING MAGNET TECH MMT [FR]) [Y] 9,13,14,18,20 * the whole document *;
 [YD]US7591448  (MARTIN THIERRY [FR], et al) [YD] 1-20 * column 2, line 60 - column 6, line 12; figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]WO2010027447  (CTS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-17 * page 4, line 1 - page 15, line 2; figures 1-6 *;
 [IY]WO2013173269  (CTS CORP [US]) [I] 20 * page 4, line 2 - page 12, line 15; figures 1-8 *[Y] 1-17,19;
 [Y]WO2015162557  (MMT AG [CH]) [Y] 13,14 * page 5, line 1 - page 10, line 13; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]DE102014224505  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO2016124715  (MMT SA [CH]) [Y] 1-17 * page 7, line 25 - page 12, line 31; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]WO2016128106  (HYDAC SYSTEM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP3188348  (TDCM CORP LTD [TW]) [Y] 6,7 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7591448
OppositionFR2382124
 US5737968
 EP0949747
 DE69917432T
 FR2919441
 US7591448
 WO2010027447
 WO2013173269
 WO2015162557
 DE102014224505
 WO2016124715
 WO2017013571
 EP3188348
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.