blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3706580

EP3706580 - FOOD PROCESSING EQUIPMENT AND METHOD WITH PLASMA ACTIVATED WATER CLEANING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2020/38]FOOD PROCESSING EQUIPMENT WITH PLASMA ACTIVATED WATER CLEANING
[2022/52]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.05.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.06.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.01.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.08.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.05.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): EE
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24]
10.05.2024No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.06.2024 [2024/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEA Food Solutions Bakel B.V.
Beekakker 11
5761 EN Bakel / NL
[2020/38]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN ERP, Joost
Akkerstraat 21
5674 RS Nuenen / NL
 [2020/38]
Representative(s)Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[2020/38]
Application number, filing date18799526.106.11.2018
[2020/38]
WO2018EP80324
Priority number, dateEP2017020040007.11.2017         Original published format: EP 17200400
[2020/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019091972
Date:16.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3706580
Date:16.09.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3706580
Date:05.07.2023
Language:EN
[2023/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:A22C17/00, A22C7/00, A61L2/00, A61L2/18, A61L2/22
[2022/52]
CPC:
A22C17/00 (EP); B08B3/08 (US); A22C17/0053 (US);
A22C17/08 (US); A22C7/0069 (EP); A61L2/18 (US);
A61L2/186 (EP); A61L2/22 (EP,US); A61L2/26 (US);
B08B3/041 (US); A61L2202/11 (US); A61L2202/17 (US) (-)
Former IPC [2020/38]A22C17/00, A22C7/00, A61L2/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NAHRUNGSMITTELBEHANDLUNGSEINTICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN MIT REINIGUNG MITTELS PLASMAAKTIVIERTEN WASSERS[2022/52]
English:FOOD PROCESSING EQUIPMENT AND METHOD WITH PLASMA ACTIVATED WATER CLEANING[2022/52]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES COMPRENANT NETTOYAGE AVEC DE L'EAU ACTIVÉE PAR PLASMA[2022/52]
Former [2020/38]KÜCHENMASCHINE MIT PLASMAAKTIVIERTER WASSERREINIGUNG
Former [2020/38]FOOD PROCESSING EQUIPMENT WITH PLASMA ACTIVATED WATER CLEANING
Former [2020/38]ÉQUIPEMENT DE TRAITEMENT D'ALIMENTS AVEC NETTOYAGE À L'EAU ACTIVÉE PAR PLASMA
Entry into regional phase27.04.2020National basic fee paid 
27.04.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.2019Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.04.2020Examination requested  [2020/38]
27.04.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.12.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.01.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2023Fee for grant paid
30.05.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.05.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)08.04.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.07.2023
CZ05.07.2023
DK05.07.2023
EE05.07.2023
FI05.07.2023
HR05.07.2023
LT05.07.2023
LV05.07.2023
RO05.07.2023
RS05.07.2023
SM05.07.2023
NO05.10.2023
GR06.10.2023
IS05.11.2023
PT06.11.2023
[2024/23]
Former [2024/22]AT05.07.2023
CZ05.07.2023
DK05.07.2023
FI05.07.2023
HR05.07.2023
LT05.07.2023
LV05.07.2023
RO05.07.2023
RS05.07.2023
SM05.07.2023
NO05.10.2023
GR06.10.2023
IS05.11.2023
PT06.11.2023
Former [2024/20]AT05.07.2023
FI05.07.2023
HR05.07.2023
LT05.07.2023
LV05.07.2023
RS05.07.2023
SM05.07.2023
NO05.10.2023
GR06.10.2023
IS05.11.2023
PT06.11.2023
Former [2024/10]AT05.07.2023
FI05.07.2023
HR05.07.2023
LT05.07.2023
LV05.07.2023
RS05.07.2023
NO05.10.2023
GR06.10.2023
IS05.11.2023
PT06.11.2023
Former [2024/09]AT05.07.2023
FI05.07.2023
LT05.07.2023
NO05.10.2023
GR06.10.2023
IS05.11.2023
Former [2024/08]LT05.07.2023
NO05.10.2023
GR06.10.2023
Cited inInternational search[A]US2013337128  (VAN GERWEN HENDRIKUS PETRUS GERARDUS [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0161] *;
 [Y]US2014100277  (GRAY ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0050] *;
 [Y]WO2016146519  (GEA FOOD SOLUTIONS BAKEL BV [NL]) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * abstract * * pages 1-15 *;
 [A]WO2016197224  (SCHIEVEN JOHANNES [CA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - page 22, line 23 *;
 [A]  - YASIN SEN ET AL, "Sterilization of Food Contacting Surfaces via Non-Thermal Plasma Treatment: A Model Study with Escherichia coli-Contaminated Stainless Steel and Polyethylene Surfaces", FOOD AND BIOPROCESS TECHNOLOGY ; AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL, New York, (20121208), vol. 6, no. 12, doi:10.1007/s11947-012-1007-2, ISSN 1935-5130, pages 3295 - 3304, XP055549522 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11947-012-1007-2
Examination   - F. Leipold ET AL, "Decontamination of a rotating cutting tool during operation by means of atmospheric pressure plasmas", Food Control, GB, (20100801), vol. 21, no. 8, doi:10.1016/j.foodcont.2010.02.006, ISSN 0956-7135, pages 1194 - 1198, XP055624505

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodcont.2010.02.006
    - GEORGES KAMGANG-YOUBI ET AL, "Microbial decontamination of stainless steel and polyethylene surfaces using GlidArc plasma activated water without chemical additives : Microbial decontamination of stainless steel and polyethylene using GlidArc", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, Hoboken, USA, (20180325), vol. 93, no. 9, doi:10.1002/jctb.5608, ISSN 0268-2575, pages 2544 - 2551, XP055549462

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jctb.5608
by applicantWO2012084215
 WO2015169812
 WO2016096751
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.