Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471305

EP3471305 - METHOD FOR PERFORMING UPLINK TRANSMISSION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BAE, Duckhyun
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / YI, Yunjung
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / HWANG, Daesung
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18801685.118.05.2018
[2019/16]
WO2018KR05750
Priority number, dateUS201762508350P18.05.2017         Original published format: US 201762508350 P
US201762512175P29.05.2017         Original published format: US 201762512175 P
US201762536994P26.07.2017         Original published format: US 201762536994 P
US201762541053P03.08.2017         Original published format: US 201762541053 P
US201762556491P10.09.2017         Original published format: US 201762556491 P
US201762559611P17.09.2017         Original published format: US 201762559611 P
US201862617087P12.01.2018         Original published format: US 201862617087 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018212628
Date:22.11.2018
Language:KO
[2018/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471305
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.11.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04L1/08, H04L5/00, H04L27/26, H04L25/03
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR PERFORMING UPLINK TRANSMISSION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION DE TRANSMISSION DE LIAISON MONTANTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019Translation filed 
14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2016219627  (AU KELVIN KAR KIN [CA], et al) [X] 1-4 * See paragraphs [0064]-[0077], [0094]; claims 1, 31; and figures 1, 3A. * [Y] 5-15;
 [Y]US2012294269  (YAMADA SHOHEI [JP], et al) [Y] 5-15 * See paragraphs [0102]-[0109], [0113]-[0125]; and figures 3-4. *;
 [A]WO2017039564  (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * See page 13, line 26-page 14, line 4; page 21, lines 7-20; and figures 5, 9-10. *;
 [A]KR20170042830  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0019]; and figures 3-6. *;
 [A]KR20160102448  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0190]-[0197], [0211]-[0218]; and figures 14a-14b, 15a-15b. *