Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472717

EP3472717 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING CONTENT FETCHING BY SELECTING TUNNEL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  26.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Change - PCT datapublished on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Luminati Networks Ltd.
3 Hamahshev St.
42507 Netanya / IL
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SHRIBMAN, Derry
9/6 Beylinson St.
6356709 Tel Aviv / IL
02 / VILENSKI, Ofer
8 Hahollandim St.
42935 Moshav Hadar Am / IL
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18803304.716.08.2018
[2019/17]
WO2018IL50910
Priority number, dateUS201762550834P28.08.2017         Original published format: US 201762550834 P
US201762563157P26.09.2017         Original published format: US 201762563157 P
US201862624208P31.01.2018         Original published format: US 201862624208 P
US201862684211P13.06.2018         Original published format: US 201862684211 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2019043687
Date:07.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3472717
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F16/9538
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES ABRUFENS VON INHALT DURCH AUSWAHL VON TUNNELVORRICHTUNGEN[2019/17]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING CONTENT FETCHING BY SELECTING TUNNEL DEVICES[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR AMÉLIORER L'EXTRACTION DE CONTENU PAR SÉLECTION DE DISPOSITIFS TUNNEL[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2018National basic fee paid 
26.11.2018Search fee paid 
26.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
26.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Cited inInternational search[A]US2016105530  (SHRIBMAN DERRY [IL], et al) [A] 1-75 * ; the entire document *;
 [A]EP2922275  (AXIS AB [SE]) [A] 1-75 * ; the entire document *;
 [A]US2007050522  (GROVE ADAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-75 * ; the entire document *