blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3700872

EP3700872 - SIZING COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING WEAKLY-COORDINATING ANION SALTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.08.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.07.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.05.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 07.02.2024  [2024/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Owens Corning Intellectual Capital, LLC
One Owens Corning Parkway
Toledo, OH 43659 / US
[2024/02]
Former [2020/36]For all designated states
OCV Intellectual Capital, LLC
One Owens Corning Parkway
Toledo, OH 43659 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COSSEMENT, Marc
Troup du Loup 2
B-4910 Polleur / BE
02 / GASCA, Jean-Philippe
Bourg Evescal
73250 Saint-Jean-de-la-Porte / FR
03 / BESSON, Yvan
687 Route des Jacquiers
73420 Mery / FR
04 / ROMEYER, Julien
159 Quai des Allobroges
73000 Chambery / FR
 [2020/40]
Former [2020/36]01 / COSSEMENT, Marc
Troup du Loup 2
B-4910 Polleur / BE
02 / GASCA, Jean-Philippe
Bourg Evescal
73250 Saint-Jean-de-la-Porte / FR
03 / BESSON, Yvan
687 Route des Jacquiers
73420 Mery / FR
04 / ROMEYER, Julien
1175 Boulevard Lepic
73100 Aix-les-Bains / FR
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
One Portwall Square
Portwall Lane
Bristol BS1 6BH / GB
[2024/06]
Former [2020/36]Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date18804157.816.10.2018
[2020/36]
WO2018US55983
Priority number, dateUS201762577997P27.10.2017         Original published format: US 201762577997 P
[2020/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019083769
Date:02.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3700872
Date:02.09.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3700872
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:C03C25/30, C08K3/16, C09D123/10
[2020/36]
CPC:
C03C25/30 (EP,US); C03C25/47 (US); C08K3/32 (US);
C08K5/544 (EP,US); C08K7/14 (US); C08K9/06 (US);
C08L23/12 (EP); C08K2003/321 (EP,US); C08L51/06 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
C08K5/544, C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L23/12, C08L23/16, C08L23/16, C08K9/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEIMUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT SCHWACH KOORDINIERENDEN ANIONENSALZEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2020/36]
English:SIZING COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING WEAKLY-COORDINATING ANION SALTS AND USES THEREOF[2020/36]
French:COMPOSITIONS D'ENCOLLAGE COMPRENANT DES SELS D'ANIONS FAIBLEMENT COORDINANTS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2020/36]
Entry into regional phase30.04.2020National basic fee paid 
30.04.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
30.04.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2020Examination requested  [2020/36]
30.04.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.11.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2023Fee for grant paid
24.11.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.11.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[I]US2010239840  (KASHIKAR SANJAY [BE], et al) [I] 1,11,12,22-25 * paragraph [0069] * * claim 20 ** remark 5;; table 2 *
by applicantUS6818698
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.