blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3706944

EP3706944 - GAS FLOW SYSTEMS FOR AN ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.10.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.08.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.05.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  05.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2024New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2020/38]
Inventor(s)01 / MAMRAK, Justin
c/o General Electric Company
1 Neumann Way
Cincinnati, Ohio 45215 / US
02 / REDDING, MacKenzie Ryan
c/o General Electric Company
1 Neumann Way
Cincinnati, Ohio 45215 / US
 [2020/38]
Representative(s)Hafner & Kohl PartmbB
Schleiermacherstraße 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
[2020/38]
Application number, filing date18807495.902.11.2018
[2020/38]
WO2018US58880
Priority number, dateUS201762584149P10.11.2017         Original published format: US 201762584149 P
[2020/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019094283
Date:16.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3706944
Date:16.09.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:B22F3/105, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B29C64/153, B29C64/371, B22F3/00
[2020/38]
CPC:
B29C64/153 (EP,US); B22F10/32 (EP,US); B22F10/322 (EP,US);
B22F10/50 (US); B22F12/20 (EP,US); B22F12/22 (EP,US);
B22F12/49 (EP,US); B22F12/70 (EP,US); B29C64/371 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US); B33Y30/00 (EP,US); B22F10/14 (EP,US);
B22F10/25 (EP,US); B22F10/28 (EP,US); B22F10/77 (EP,US);
B22F12/67 (EP,US); B22F2201/02 (US); B22F2201/11 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/38]
TitleGerman:GASSTRÖMUNGSSYSTEME FÜR EINE MASCHINE ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG[2020/38]
English:GAS FLOW SYSTEMS FOR AN ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING MACHINE[2020/38]
French:SYSTÈMES D'ÉCOULEMENT DE GAZ POUR UNE MACHINE DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE[2020/38]
Entry into regional phase30.04.2020National basic fee paid 
30.04.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
30.04.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2020Examination requested  [2020/38]
30.04.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.01.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.10.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XA]US6007318  (RUSSELL DAVID B [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12,13 * figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 52 * [A] 11;
 [XA]US2003235635  (FONG JON JODY [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-13 * figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0061] * [A] 10;
 [A]US2011291331  (SCOTT SIMON PETER [GB]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *;
 [XA]DE102015109846  (ACONITY3D GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-8,11-13 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0065] * [A] 2,9,10;
 [XA]US2017014905  (KAWADA SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9,11-13 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraphs [0066] , [0 72] * [A] 2,8,10;
 [XA]US2017146382  (GOLD SCOTT ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3-13 * figures 1,2,4 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * [A] 2
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.