Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471309

EP3471309 - METHODS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING ACKNOWLEDGMENT INFORMATION BETWEEN TERMINAL AND BASE STATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND DEVICES FOR SUPPORTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  22.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Seonwook
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-Gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / YANG, Suckchel
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-Gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
03 / AHN, Joonkui
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-Gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
04 / KIM, Jaehyung
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-Gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18818398.215.06.2018
[2019/16]
WO2018KR06774
Priority number, dateUS201762520497P15.06.2017         Original published format: US 201762520497 P
US201762521357P16.06.2017         Original published format: US 201762521357 P
US201762525169P26.06.2017         Original published format: US 201762525169 P
US201762543971P11.08.2017         Original published format: US 201762543971 P
US201762555694P08.09.2017         Original published format: US 201762555694 P
US201762586835P15.11.2017         Original published format: US 201762586835 P
US201762587455P16.11.2017         Original published format: US 201762587455 P
US201762593157P30.11.2017         Original published format: US 201762593157 P
US201862620407P22.01.2018         Original published format: US 201862620407 P
US201862630252P14.02.2018         Original published format: US 201862630252 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018230999
Date:20.12.2018
Language:KO
[2018/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471309
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/16, H04L1/18, H04W72/12
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON BESTÄTIGUNGSINFORMATIONEN ZWISCHEN EINEM ENDGERÄT UND EINER BASISSTATION IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DAVON[2019/16]
English:METHODS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING ACKNOWLEDGMENT INFORMATION BETWEEN TERMINAL AND BASE STATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, AND DEVICES FOR SUPPORTING SAME[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION D'INFORMATIONS D'ACCUSÉ DE RÉCEPTION ENTRE UN TERMINAL ET UNE STATION DE BASE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET DISPOSITIFS LES PRENANT EN CHARGE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019Translation filed 
11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Search fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Cited inInternational search[A]KR20110063685  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-28 * See paragraphs [0075]-[0081]; and figure 5. *;
 [A]WO2016063758  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1-28 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0050]; and figures 1A-3C. *;
 [A]US8457091  (PANI DIANA [CA], et al) [A] 1-28 * See column 4, line 10-colum-n25, line 59; and figures 1-14. *;
 [A]KR20130032861  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-28 * See paragraphs [00521-[0328]: and figures 5-17. *
 [A]  - HUAWEI et al., "Discussion on CBG-based Feedback", Rl-1706964, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #89, Hangzhou, China, (20170506), XP051261587 [A] 1-28 * See sections 1, 3. *