Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464711

EP3464711 - HEAT PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.02.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cricut, Inc.
10855 S. River Front Parking, Suite 300
South Jordan, Utah 84095 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / STOPP, Grayson
16 Jessie St. Apt. 109
San Francisco CA 94105 / US
02 / CRISP, Thomas
510 Cerrito Plaza
Unit 301
El Cerrito CA 94530 / US
03 / LIN, Lk
Room 706 7/f Sail Plaza
1052 Nanhai Road
Shenzen 518067 / CN
04 / ZHU, Carry
No. 588 Jiahe Road
Xiamen 361009 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date18821978.601.08.2018
[2019/15]
WO2018US44799
Priority number, dateUS201762540021P01.08.2017         Original published format: US 201762540021 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2019028135
Date:07.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464711
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:D06Q1/10, D06Q1/12, D06C15/10, D06C23/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HEISSPRESSE[2019/15]
English:HEAT PRESS[2019/15]
French:PRESSE À CHALEUR[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase03.01.2019National basic fee paid 
03.01.2019Search fee paid 
03.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
03.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
11.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Cited inInternational search[YA]JP2005029217  (TOMY CO LTD) [Y] 1, 2, 7-15, 17-20 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0036] and figures 1-8. * [A] 3-6, 16;
 [Y]JP2002166100  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1, 2, 7-15, 17-20 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0026] and figures 1-6. *;
 [A]KR20050096555  (SEO JEONG SAM [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0052] and figures 1-2. *;
 [A]US2009165341  (JANAKIRAMAN CHANDRA MOHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0041] and figures 1-4. *;
 [A]KR960001851U  (KIM, JONG MOON) [A] 1-20 * See claims 1-2 and figures 1-3. *