Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468532

EP3468532 - DISPENSING DEVICE AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF RHINITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.08.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glenmark Specialty S.A.
Avenue Léopold-Robert 37
2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DHUPPAD, Ulhas, R.
Bunglow No. B-3
Coral Apt. Resi 1-Phase
Shahu Nagar
Motwani Factory Road, Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422101 / IN
02 / KATKURWAR, Ashok
B-10
Ishwar Paradise Apartment
Ashoka Marg
Behind Fem Cinema, Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422011 / IN
03 / GUPTA, Yashwant
Flat No. 2
Antriksh Apartment
Tagor Nagar
Front Of Ambedkar Nagar, Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422006 / IN
04 / ANKAM, Rajesh
Flat N. 204
E Wing
Dream Nest
Dgp Nagar Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422101 / IN
05 / DHATRAK, Chandrakant
S. No. 11/1-4
Plot No. 9
Sadguru Krupa Bangloo
Near Charandas Market, Jail Road, Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422101 / IN
06 / KHAIRATKAR-JOSHI, Neelima
C-101
Devprayag Chs
Bhakti Mandir Rd
Hari Niwas
Thane (W) Maharashtra 400602 / IN
07 / KULKARNI, Abhay
1004
Orchid Residency
Plot No: 63/61A
Sector -14, Koparkhairane
Navi Mumbai Maharashtra 400709 / IN
08 / WALE, Dinesh, Pradeep
At Post-Mangrule
Taluka.
Tuljapur District
Osmanabad Maharashtra 413601 / IN
09 / BHOSALE, Vikram, Mansingh
Flat 303, Dattaraj CHS
Plot N.366A, Sector 5
Sanpada
Navi Mumbai Maharashtra 400705 / IN
10 / AGARWAL, Piyush
Bld No 2/606 Dheeraj Sagar
Opposite Goregaon Sports Club
Malad (west)
Mumbai Maharashtra 400064 / IN
11 / KEOHANE, Patrick
Emery Hill Street
London SW1P 1PD / GB
12 / TANTRY, Sudeesh, K.
3917 Hillcrest Drive
Furlong, PA 18925 / US
13 / OH, Chad
250 King Street
Apt. 724
San Francisco, CA 94107-5492 / US
 [2019/30]
Former [2019/17]01 / DHUPPAD, Ulhas, R.
Bunglow No. B-3
Coral Apt. Resi 1-Phase
Shahu Nagar
Motwani Factory Road, Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422101 / IN
02 / KATKURWAR, Ashok
B-10
Ishwar Paradise Apartment
Ashoka Marg
Behind Fem Cinema, Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422011 / IN
03 / GUPTA, Yashwant
Flat No. 2
Antriksh Apartment
Tagor Nagar
Front Of Ambedkar Nagar, Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422006 / IN
04 / ANKAM, Rajesh
Flat N. 204
E Wing
Dream Nest
Dgp Nagar Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422101 / IN
05 / DHATRAK, Chandrakant
S. No. 11/1-4
Plot No. 9
Sadguru Krupa Bangloo
Near Charandas Market, Jail Road, Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422101 / IN
06 / KHAIRATKAR-JOSHI, Neelima
C-101
Devprayag Chs
Bhakti Mandir Rd
Hari Niwas
Thane (W) Maharashtra 400602 / IN
07 / KULKARNI, Abhay
1004
Orchid Residency
Plot No: 63/61A
Sector -14, Koparkhairane
Navi Mumbai Maharashtra 400709 / IN
08 / WALE, Dinesh, Pradeep
At Post-Mangrule
Taluka.
Tuljapur District
Osmanabad Maharashtra 413601 / IN
09 / BHOSALE, Vikram, Mansingh
D/18 Shivaji Nagar G.D.
Mahajani Road
Siwree
Mumbai Maharashtra 400015 / IN
10 / AGARWAL, Piyush
Bld No 2/606 Dheeraj Sagar
Opposite Goregaon Sports Club
Malad (west)
Mumbai Maharashtra 400064 / IN
11 / KEOHANE, Patrick
Emery Hill Street
London SW1P 1PD / GB
12 / TANTRY, Sudeesh, K.
3917 Hillcrest Drive
Furlong, PA 18925 / US
13 / OH, Chad
250 King Street
Apt. 724
San Francisco, CA 94107-5492 / US
Former [2019/16]01 / DHUPPAD, Ulhas, R.
Bunglow No. B-3
Coral Apt. Resi 1-Phase
Shahu Nagar
Motwani Factory Road, Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422101 / IN
02 / KATKURWAR, Ashok
B-10
Ishwar Paradise Apartment
Ashoka Marg
Behind Fem Cinema, Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422011 / IN
03 / GUPTA, Yashwant
Flat No. 2
Antriksh Apartment
Tagor Nagar
Front Of Ambedkar Nagar, Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422006 / IN
04 / ANKAM, Rajesh
Flat N. 204
E Wing
Dream Nest
Dgp Nagar Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422101 / IN
05 / DHATRAK, Chandrakant
S. No. 11/1-4
Plot No. 9
Sadguru Krupa Bangloo
Near Charandas Market, Jail Road, Nashik Road
Nashik Maharashtra 422101 / IN
06 / KHAIRATKAR-JOSHI, Neelima
C-101
Devprayag Chs
Bhakti Mandir Rd
Hari Niwas
Thane (W) Maharashtra 400602 / IN
07 / KULKARNI, Abhay
1004
Orchid Residency
Plot No: 63/61A
Sector -14, Koparkhairane
Navi Mumbai Maharashtra 400709 / IN
08 / WALE, Dinesh, Pradeep
At Post-Mangrule
Taluka.
Tuljapur District
Osmanabad Maharashtra 413601 / IN
09 / BHOSALE, Vikram, Mansingh
D/18 Shivaji Nagar G.D.
Mahajani Road
Siwree
Mumbai Maharashtra 400015 / IN
10 / AGARWAL, Piyush
Bld No 2/606 Dheeraj Sagar
Opposite Goregaon Sports Club
Malad (west)
Mumbai Maharashtra 400064 / IN
11 / KEOHANE, Patrick
Emery Hill Street
London SW1P 1PD / GB
12 / TANTRY, Sudeesh, K.
2707 Brocket Court
Jamison, PA 18929-1772 / US
13 / OH, Chad
250 King Street
Apt. 724
San Francisco, CA 94107-5492 / US
Representative(s)HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18823894.328.06.2018
[2019/16]
WO2018US40098
Priority number, dateUS20171563612028.06.2017         Original published format: US201715636120
US20171569150030.08.2017         Original published format: US201715691500
US20171571666127.09.2017         Original published format: US201715716661
US20171584206314.12.2017         Original published format: US201715842063
US20181590359723.02.2018         Original published format: US201815903597
IN20182101442616.04.2018         Original published format: IN201821014426
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2019006173
Date:03.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468532
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.01.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K47/02, A61M11/00, A61M15/08, B05B11/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABGABEVORRICHTUNG UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RHINITIS[2019/16]
English:DISPENSING DEVICE AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF RHINITIS[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION ET COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA RHINITE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
12.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2016287612  (DHUPPAD ULHAS R [IN], et al) [X] 1,10,12,17 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] , [0 33] , [0 35] , [0 60] , [ 100] - [0104] - [ 106] , [ 132] , [ 134] * [I] 2-9,11,13-21;
 [A]EP2014305  (TOKO YAKUHIN KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2015036902  (GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [IN]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *
International search[Y]WO0189984  (CARTER WALLACE [US]) [Y] 1, 7-20 * ; pg. 6, lines 10-15; pg. 7, lines 1-2; pg. 10; lines 5-8; pg. 11, lines 21-22; pg. 12, lines 1-2, 11-13; pg. 15, lines 7-10; figure 11; Claims 27, 29; figures 3, 4, 11 *;
 [Y]US9078923  (DHUPPAD ULHAS [IN], et al) [Y] 1, 7-20 * ; column 5, lines 16-19; column 7, lines 63-66; column 13, lines 40-43, 50-54; column 14, lines 50-54 Claims 1, 7, 19 *;
 [Y]US2010276457  (PETIT LUDOVIC [FR], et al) [Y] 9-10, 13-20 * ; figures 3,4; paragraphs [0011], [0030], [0037] *;
 [Y]US2005158247  (VERONESI PAOLO A [IT], et al) [Y] 8, 19 * ; paragraph [0076] *;
 [A]US5062549  (SMITH DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 2-4, 5-6, 21-22 * ; column 2, lines 30-45; figure 3 *;
 [A]US2007233012  (LERRICK ANDREW J [US], et al) [A] 2-4, 5-6, 21-22 * ; paragraphs [0046], [0049]; figure 5 *