Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469829

EP3469829 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.02.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Gyeongcheol
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
02 / YI, Seungjune
IP Center
LG Electronics Inc.
19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06772 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Katérle, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18826476.609.08.2018
[2019/16]
WO2018KR09130
Priority number, dateUS201762543996P11.08.2017         Original published format: US 201762543996 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2019031892
Date:14.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469829
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR14.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/06
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINER DATENEINHEIT[2019/16]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA UNIT[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'UNITÉ DE DONNÉES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2010135202  (CHUN SUNG DUCK [KR], et al) [Y] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0056], [0082]; claims 15-19, 21; and figures 7-8. *;
 [Y]US8170060  (YI SEUNG JUNE [KR], et al) [Y] 1-12 * See column 3, lines 28-64; column 7, lines 47-52; claim 10; and figures 2-3, 6. *;
 [A]EP2830352  (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0101]-[0117]; claim 1; and figures 23-25. *;
 [A]US2009207786  (YI SEUNG JUNE [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0100]-[0107]; claim 1; and figures 5-7. *;
 [A]EP3179770  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0025]-[0033]; claim 1; and figures 7-8. *