blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3654438

EP3654438 - COIN-SHAPED BATTERY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.12.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.05.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.04.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Zosen Corporation
7-89, Nanko-kita 1-chome Suminoe-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 559-8559 / JP
[2020/21]
Inventor(s)01 / SUGIYO, Takeshi
c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION
7-89 Nanko-Kita 1-chome
Suminoe-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP
02 / KAWASE, Hirokazu
c/o HITACHI ZOSEN CORPORATION
7-89 Nanko-Kita 1-chome
Suminoe-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 559-8559 / JP
 [2020/21]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2020/21]
Application number, filing date18832038.605.07.2018
[2020/21]
WO2018JP25486
Priority number, dateJP2017013656112.07.2017         Original published format: JP 2017136561
[2020/21]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019013084
Date:17.01.2019
Language:JA
[2019/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3654438
Date:20.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3654438
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.01.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2020
ClassificationIPC:H01M10/0585, H01M10/04, H01M10/0562, H01M50/109
[2024/01]
CPC:
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR,US); H01M10/0585 (EP,KR,US); B05D1/06 (KR);
H01M10/0468 (EP,US); H01M50/109 (EP,KR,US); H01M2300/0068 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP); Y02P70/50 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/31]H01M10/0585, H01M10/0562, H01M2/02, H01M10/04
Former IPC [2020/21]H01M10/0585, H01M10/0562
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/21]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MÜNZENFÖRMIGE BATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2020/21]
English:COIN-SHAPED BATTERY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME[2020/21]
French:BATTERIE EN FORME DE PIÈCE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION[2020/21]
Entry into regional phase04.02.2020Translation filed 
04.02.2020National basic fee paid 
04.02.2020Search fee paid 
04.02.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.2020Examination requested  [2020/21]
26.01.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.05.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2024Fee for grant paid
15.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]JP2010056067  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [YD] 1-4 * paragraphs [0015] - [0028] * * figure 1 *;
 [XY]JP2010282803  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO, et al) [X] 4 * paragraphs [0008] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0046] * * figures 1-4 *[Y] 1-4;
 [XA]WO2013153693  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [X] 1 * example 5 * * figure 1 * [A] 2-4
International search[Y]JP2010056067  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0013], [0016], [0022], [0037]-[0038], fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2010282803  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO, et al) [Y] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0013]-[0014], [0017]-[0020], [0026]-[0046], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2011064842  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * & US 2012/0225351 A1 & CN 102187500 A & KR 10-2011-0082506 A *;
 [A]US2017162901  (CHEN ZHEBO [US], et al) [A] 1-4* & WO 2017/096088 A1 *;
 [A]WO2017104405  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * (Family: none) *
ExaminationUS6355378
by applicantJPS5317195B
 JP2010056067
 JP2011159413
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.