blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3654695

EP3654695 - PERFORMING HANDOVER BETWEEN DIFFERENT RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2020/21]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING HANDOVER IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM
[2024/02]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.03.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.01.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.05.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.04.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 17.04.2024  [2024/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2020/21]
Inventor(s)01 / CHOI, Jihyeon
504
200-22
Dongsuwon-ro 146beon-gil
Gwonseon-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16670 / KR
02 / PARK, Jongho
102-807
10
Yeouidaebang-ro 44-gil
Dongjak-gu
Seoul 06943 / KR
03 / WON, Sangyeon
104-404
41
Sinbanpo-ro 23-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06509 / KR
04 / KIM, Hanseok
201-302
35
Samseong-ro 51-gil
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 06280 / KR
05 / LEE, Daewoo
103-2405
13-10
Seocho-daero 65-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 06602 / KR
 [2020/21]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2020/21]
Application number, filing date18832183.025.05.2018
[2020/21]
WO2018KR05944
Priority number, dateKR2017008922713.07.2017         Original published format: KR 20170089227
[2020/21]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019013446
Date:17.01.2019
Language:KO
[2019/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3654695
Date:20.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3654695
Date:17.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR17.01.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2020
ClassificationIPC:H04W36/00, // H04W36/14, H04W36/36, H04W88/06
[2020/21]
CPC:
H04W36/0094 (EP,KR,US); H04W36/00 (EP); H04W36/0058 (US);
H04W36/00837 (EP,KR,US); H04W84/042 (KR); H04W84/12 (KR,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,KR); H04W36/1446 (EP,KR); H04W36/304 (EP,KR);
H04W36/362 (EP,KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES HANDOVERS ZWISCHEN VERSCHIEDENEN FUNKZUGANGSTECHNOLOGIEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2024/02]
English:PERFORMING HANDOVER BETWEEN DIFFERENT RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2024/02]
French:RÉALISATION D'UN TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE ENTRE DIFFÉRENTES TECHNOLOGIES D'ACCÈS RADIO DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2024/02]
Former [2020/21]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER ÜBERGABE IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM
Former [2020/21]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING HANDOVER IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM
Former [2020/21]PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR RÉALISER UN TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL
Entry into regional phase11.02.2020Translation filed 
11.02.2020National basic fee paid 
11.02.2020Search fee paid 
11.02.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2020Examination requested  [2020/21]
17.07.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2024Fee for grant paid
13.03.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.03.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2015215839  (JOHANSSON PER JOHAN MIKAEL [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0031]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0047] - [0048]; figure 8 * * paragraph [0052]; figure 10 * [Y] 3-10 [I] 13;
 [XY]US2015289186  (STÅLNACKE PER-DANIEL [SE], et al) [X] 12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0020] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0059]; figure 5 * [Y] 3-5,9;
 [Y]  - CATT, "3GPP TSG RAN WG2 #91bis; R2-154071; RRM Measurements for WLAN", vol. RAN WG2, no. Malmo, Sweden; 20151005 - 20151009, (20151004), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-154071-RRM MEASUREMENTS FOR LWA AND LWI, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20151004), XP051004683 [Y] 6-8,10 * chapters 2.1.1, 2.3.1 and 2.3.2 *
 [A]  - 3GPP TR 37.834 V12.0.0 (2013-12), "3GPP TR 37.834 V12.0.0 (2013-12); 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Study on Wireless Local Area Network (WLAN) - 3GPP radio interworking (Release 12)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 37.834, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20140107), vol. RAN WG2, no. V12.0.0, pages 1 - 17, XP050729404 [A] 1-14 * pages 8-16, chapters 6.1.1, 6.1.1.1, 6.1.1.2 * * pages 8-16, chapters 6.1.2, 6.1.2.1 * * pages 8-16, chapters 6.1.3, 6.1.3.1 *
 [A]  - KASSAR M ET AL, "A mobile-controlled handover management scheme in a loosely-coupled 3G-WLAN interworking architecture", WIRELESS DAYS, 2008. WD '08. 1ST IFIP, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081124), ISBN 978-1-4244-2828-1, pages 1 - 5, XP031448167 [A] 1-14 * page 3, column 1; figure 2 * * page 3, column 1, lines 8-37 *
 [A]  - RAHIL AHMAD ET AL, "Statistical learning and multiple linear regression model for network selection using MIH", THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON E-TECHNOLOGIES AND NETWORKS FOR DEVELOPMENT (ICEND2014), IEEE, (20140429), doi:10.1109/ICEND.2014.6991378, pages 189 - 194, XP032710008 [A] 1-14 * chapter 1) Mobile Controlled Handover Decision (MCHO); page 190, column 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICeND.2014.6991378
International search[XY]KR20100070120  (KT CORP [KR]) [X] 1-5, 9, 11-14 [Y] 6-8, 10;
 [A]KR20120026441  (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [A] 1-14;
 [A]KR20150036097  [A] 1-14;
 [A]KR20150120485  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR])[A] 1-14;
 [Y]US9572071  (CAPDEVIELLE VERONIQUE [FR], et al) [Y] 6-8, 10
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.