blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3655718

EP3655718 - MULTI-FRACTAL HEAT SINK SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.09.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.04.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2023Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.11.2023  [2023/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Poltorak, Alexander
128 W. Maple Avenue
Monsey, NY 10952 / US
For all designated states
Fractal Heatsink Technologies, LLC
990 Biscayne Boulevard
Miami, Florida 33132 / US
[2020/22]
Inventor(s)01 / POLTORAK, Alexander
990 Biscayne Boulevard
Miami, Florida 33132 / US
 [2020/22]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[N/P]
Former [2020/22]Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date18836056.417.07.2018
[2020/22]
WO2018US42564
Priority number, dateUS201762533421P17.07.2017         Original published format: US 201762533421 P
[2020/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019018446
Date:24.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3655718
Date:27.05.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.01.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2021
ClassificationIPC:F28D15/00, F28D21/00, F28F1/40, F28F13/06, F28F21/02, F28F7/00, F28F3/04, F28F13/12
[2021/10]
CPC:
H01L21/4871 (EP); H01L23/367 (EP,US); F28F13/12 (EP,US);
F28F3/048 (EP); G05B15/02 (US); H01L23/3736 (EP,US);
H01L23/467 (EP,US); H01L23/473 (EP,US); H05K7/20136 (US);
H05K7/20154 (US); H05K7/20172 (US); H05K7/20209 (US);
H05K7/20272 (US); H05K7/20281 (US); H05K7/20418 (US);
F28F2210/02 (EP,US); F28F2215/10 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2020/22]F28D15/00, F28D21/00, F28F1/40, F28F13/06, F28F21/02, F28F7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/22]
TitleGerman:MULTIFRAKTALES KÜHLKÖRPERSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2020/22]
English:MULTI-FRACTAL HEAT SINK SYSTEM AND METHOD[2020/22]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DISSIPATEUR THERMIQUE MULTI-FRACTAL[2020/22]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2020National basic fee paid 
21.01.2020Search fee paid 
21.01.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2020Examination requested  [2020/22]
13.09.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2023Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2023/44]
09.06.2023Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2023/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.202003   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2020
31.07.202104   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2022
31.07.202205   M06   Not yet paid
31.07.202306   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]CN101394730  ;
 [A]CN200944011Y  ;
 [X]JP2005340681  (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2012193085  (WHITTLE JAMES ELDRED [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-11 *;
 [A]  - LUO FAN ET AL, "Heat exchanger: from micro- to multi-scale design optimization", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ENERGY RESEARCH, WILEY, CHICHESTER, GB, vol. 31, no. 13, doi:10.1002/ER.1298, ISSN 0363-907X, (20070213), pages 1266 - 1274, (20070213), XP002541853 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ER.1298
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (20210129), vol. 2009, no. 26, Database accession no. 2009-G75254, XP002801908 & CN101394730 A 20090325 (UNIV BEIHANG) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (20210129), vol. 2008, no. 13, Database accession no. 2008-B72315, XP002801909 & CN200944011Y Y 20070905 (UNIV SOUTHEAST) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - HUANG ZHIWEI ET AL, "Review of nature-inspired heat exchanger technology", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF REFRIGERATION, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20170308), vol. 78, doi:10.1016/J.IJREFRIG.2017.03.006, ISSN 0140-7007, pages 1 - 17, XP085016112 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijrefrig.2017.03.006
International search[A]US4346914  (LIVERS GERALD D, et al) [A] 27 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2002080563  (PENCE DEBORAH V [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * , entire document *;
 [XA]US2008115916  (SCHUETTE FRANZ MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1, 9, 11 * , entire document * [A] 15-17, 19, 29-34;
 [A]US2009071624  (ZHANG WEN-XIANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-34 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2009321045  (HERNON DOMHNAILL [IE], et al) [A] 1-34 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2015327404  (WANG JENN-SHING [TW], et al) [A] 1-34* , entire document *;
 [XA]US2016320149  (POLTORAK ALEXANDER [US]) [X] 1-8, 10, 12-14, 18, 20-26, 28 * , entire document * [A] 15-17, 19, 27, 29-30
by applicantUS2016320149
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.