blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3721317

EP3721317 - ORIENTATION SPECIFIC CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.12.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.07.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.12.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.09.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 14.02.2024  [2024/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
[2021/45]
Former [2020/42]For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Daniel C.
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft
Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / AAGAARD, Karsten
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft
Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / SRINIVASAN, Nishant
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft
Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / ROUGER, Benoit Guillaume Henri
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft
Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / SCHWEERS, Michael
MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC One Microsoft
Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2020/42]
Representative(s)Page White Farrer
Bedford House
21a John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2024/07]
Former [2020/42]Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date18837104.128.12.2018
[2020/42]
WO2018US67771
Priority number, dateUS20181586960212.01.2018         Original published format: US201815869602
[2020/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019139786
Date:18.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3721317
Date:14.10.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3721317
Date:14.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2019
ClassificationIPC:G06F1/16
[2020/42]
CPC:
G06F1/1684 (EP,US); G06F1/1677 (US); G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F1/3206 (US); G06F1/3287 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:RICHTUNGSSPEZIFISCHE STEUERUNG[2020/42]
English:ORIENTATION SPECIFIC CONTROL[2020/42]
French:COMMANDE SPÉCIFIQUE D'UNE ORIENTATION[2020/42]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2020National basic fee paid 
10.07.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2020Examination requested  [2020/42]
10.07.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.07.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2023Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.12.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2024Fee for grant paid
10.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2004233627  (ANDERSON HYRUM M [US], et al) [X] 12-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0016] - [0022]; figures 1-4 * [I] 1-11;
 [A]US2016187923  (ZENG ZHIRONG [CN], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0023] - [0057]; figures 1-12 *
ExaminationUS2006019703
 EP2184752
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.