EP3659519 - MAGNETIC ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 25.12.2024 [2024/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IUCF-HYU (Industry-University Cooperation Foundation Hanyang University) 222 Wangsimni-ro Seongdong-gu Seoul 04763 / KR | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Gun Hee (Dogok-dong Dogok Rexle Apt.) 402-401 221 Seolleung-ro, Gangnam-gu Seoul 06276 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Eun Soo (Banpo-dong Banpo Prugio Apt.) 103-702 4 Sinbanpo-ro 15-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06504 / KR | 03 /
NAM, Jae Kwang 202-801 29 Goyang-daero 1384beon-gil Deogyang-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 10468 / KR | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Wetterkreuz 3 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 18837839.2 | 03.04.2018 | [2020/23] | WO2018KR03911 | Priority number, date | KR20170094167 | 25.07.2017 Original published format: KR 20170094167 | [2020/23] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019022340 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3659519 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3659519 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/02 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
A61B34/73 (EP,US);
A61B10/0233 (EP,KR);
A61B10/0266 (EP,US);
A61B10/04 (US);
A61B34/30 (EP);
A61B34/37 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHER ROBOTER | [2020/23] | English: | MAGNETIC ROBOT | [2020/23] | French: | ROBOT MAGNÉTIQUE | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2020 | Translation filed | 14.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 06.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2023 | BG | 14.06.2023 | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | IT | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | NL | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | [2024/52] |
Former [2024/51] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
BG | 14.06.2023 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010179381 (KAWANO HIRONAO [JP], et al) [Y] 2-6* paragraph [0124] *; | [Y]KR101394798B (IUCF HYU [KR]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]KR101541068B (UNIV NAT CHONNAM IND FOUND [KR]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2002102347 (NIPRO CORP)[A] 1-7; | [Y]WO2008105393 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 2-6; | [A]JP5399253B (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP.) [A] 1-7; | [A]KR20140026957 (UNIV NAT CHONNAM IND FOUND [KR]) [A] 1-7; | [XY]KR20150022206 (UNIV NAT CHONNAM IND FOUND [KR]) [X] 1, 7 [Y] 2-6 |