blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3661315

EP3661315 - COMMUNICATION METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.02.2021
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.05.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.02.2021Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.03.2021  [2021/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2020/23]
Inventor(s)01 / YING, Jiangwei
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / YANG, Yanmei
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / DENG, Qiang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / HUANG, Zhenglei
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2020/23]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2020/23]
Application number, filing date18845793.124.05.2018
[2020/23]
WO2018CN88280
Priority number, dateCN20171069904515.08.2017         Original published format: CN201710699045
[2020/23]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019033817
Date:21.02.2019
Language:ZH
[2019/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3661315
Date:03.06.2020
Language:EN
[2020/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN21.02.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.2020
ClassificationIPC:H04W60/04, H04W48/04, H04W48/14, H04W76/30, // H04W48/20, H04W76/27
[2020/32]
CPC:
H04W76/30 (EP); H04W36/0033 (CN); H04W60/04 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/0055 (CN); H04W36/08 (CN); H04W48/04 (CN,US);
H04W52/0212 (US); H04W48/20 (EP); H04W76/27 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/23]H04W76/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/23]
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM[2020/23]
English:COMMUNICATION METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM[2020/23]
French:PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL, ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION[2020/23]
Entry into regional phase26.02.2020Translation filed 
26.02.2020National basic fee paid 
26.02.2020Search fee paid 
26.02.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.02.2020Examination requested  [2020/23]
04.02.2021Application withdrawn by applicant  [2021/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; System Architecture for the 5G System; Stage 2 (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD ; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION ; 3GPP TS 23.501, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20170726), vol. SA WG2, no. V1.2.0, pages 1 - 166, XP051336684 [A] 1-15 * chapters 3.1, 5.3-5.5, 5.6.2, 5.6.5, 5.15.3 *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Procedures for the 5G System; Stage 2 (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD ; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION ; 3GPP TS 23.502, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20170714), vol. SA WG2, no. V0.5.0, pages 1 - 148, XP051336671 [A] 1-15 * chapters 3.1, 5.3, 5.4, A.3.1.5, A.3.1.6 *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on Architecture for Next Generation System (Release 14)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.799, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20161216), vol. SA WG2, no. V14.0.0, pages 1 - 522, XP051230010 [A] 1-15 * chapters 6.3.2, 6.3.8, 6.3.9, 6.3.11, 6.3.14, 6.3.15, 6.3.16, 6.3.18, 6.3.19, 6.3.23, 6.3.25, 6.3.26, 6.3.27, 6.4.18, 6.7.5.5, 8.3, 8.4, 8.8 *
 [A]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "TS 23.501: Update to RRC-Inactive", vol. SA WG2, no. San Jose Del Cabo, Mexico; 20170626 - 20170630, (20170620), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-174417_ TS 23.501 RRC-INACTIVE UPDATES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_122_Cabo/Docs/, (20170620), XP051309478 [A] 1-15 * chapters 1, 5.3.4.1.1, 5.4.1.3 *
 [A]  - CATT, "TS 23.502: PDU session deactivation due to mobility restriction", vol. SA WG2, no. San Jose Del Cabo, Mexico; 20170626 - 20170630, (20170629), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-174785_WAS_174593_TS 23.502 PDU SESSION DEACTIVATION DUE TO MOBILITY RESTRICTION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/SA2/Docs/, (20170629), XP051303617 [A] 1-15 * chapters 1, 4.2.6 *
International searchCN106658758  [xy] (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD) [x] 8,9,25,26 [y] 1,2,4,5,18,19,21,22;
    [xyXY] - Anonymous, "3GPP Standard; 3GPP TR 23.799", 3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on Architecture for Next Generation System (Release 14), (20161216), vol. SA WG2 , no. V14.0.0, pages 1 - 522, XP051230010 [x] 3,6,7,10-17,20,23,24,27-34 [y] 1,2,4,5,18,19,21,22
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.