blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3705594

EP3705594 - HIGH-STRENGTH MULTIPHASE TINNED STEEL RAW PLATE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.02.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.01.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.09.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.08.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baoshan Iron & Steel Co., Ltd.
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
[2020/37]
Inventor(s)01 / LIAN, Fuliang
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
02 / LIANG, Gaofei
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
03 / CHEN, Hongxing
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
04 / ZHAO, Shunli
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
05 / BAN, Bijun
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
06 / LI, Xiujun
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
07 / XU, Gang
No.885 Fujin Road
Baoshan District
Shanghai 201900 / CN
 [2020/37]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2020/37]
Application number, filing date18850495.528.08.2018
[2020/37]
WO2018CN102619
Priority number, dateCN20171076169030.08.2017         Original published format: CN201710761690
[2020/37]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019042268
Date:07.03.2019
Language:ZH
[2019/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3705594
Date:09.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3705594
Date:20.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.03.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.06.2021
ClassificationIPC:C22C38/14, C22C38/06, C21D8/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/16, C22C38/12, C22C38/18, C22C38/20, C22C38/22, C22C38/26, C22C38/32
[2021/27]
CPC:
C21D8/02 (EP); C22C38/04 (EP,CN,US); C21D8/0247 (CN,US);
C21D1/26 (US); C21D6/002 (US); C21D6/005 (US);
C21D6/008 (US); C21D8/0205 (US); C21D8/0236 (CN,US);
C22C38/001 (CN,US); C22C38/002 (CN,US); C22C38/06 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,CN); C22C38/14 (EP,CN); C22C38/16 (EP,CN);
C22C38/18 (EP,CN); C22C38/20 (EP,CN,US); C22C38/22 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/26 (EP,CN,US); C22C38/28 (US); C22C38/32 (EP,CN,US);
C21D2211/003 (CN,US); C21D2211/005 (CN,US); C21D2211/008 (CN,US);
C21D2211/009 (CN,US) (-)
Former IPC [2020/37]C22C38/14, C22C38/06, C21D8/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HOCHFESTE VERZINNTE MEHRPHASEN-STAHLROHPLATTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2020/37]
English:HIGH-STRENGTH MULTIPHASE TINNED STEEL RAW PLATE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR[2020/37]
French:PLAQUE BRUTE EN ACIER ÉTAMÉ MULTIPHASE À RÉSISTANCE ÉLEVÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ[2020/37]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2020Translation filed 
05.03.2020National basic fee paid 
05.03.2020Search fee paid 
05.03.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2020Examination requested  [2020/37]
29.12.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.09.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2024Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.02.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2024Fee for grant paid
08.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
04.08.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
08.08.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4698103  (HOOGENDOORN THOMAS M [NL], et al) [A] 1-9 * columns 3-4; claims 1-18 *;
 [A]US2009250147  (NISHIDA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - paragraph [0046] *;
 [A]CN102286688  (BAOSHAN IRON&STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-9* abstract *;
 [A]CN102719738  (ANGANG STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2016060248  (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [X]CN106086643  (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL) [X] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [AP]CN108118248  (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL) [AP] 1-9 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.