blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3653024

EP3653024 - BRIGHT AND CLEAN X-RAY SOURCE FOR X-RAY BASED METROLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.04.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2023New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kla-Tencor Corporation
One Technology Drive
Milpitas, California 95035 / US
[2020/21]
Inventor(s)01 / KHODYKIN, Oleg
2987 Childers Lane
Santa Cruz, CA 95062 / US
 [2020/21]
Representative(s)FRKelly
Waterways House
Grand Canal Quay
Dublin D02 PD39 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2020/21]FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
Application number, filing date18851196.829.08.2018
[2020/21]
WO2018US48530
Priority number, dateUS201762551785P30.08.2017         Original published format: US 201762551785 P
US20181611276226.08.2018         Original published format: US201816112762
[2020/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019046417
Date:07.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3653024
Date:20.05.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.03.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.2021
ClassificationIPC:H05G2/00
[2020/21]
CPC:
H05G2/008 (EP,KR,US); H05G2/005 (KR); G01N23/20008 (US);
G01N23/201 (EP,US); H05G2/006 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/21]
TitleGerman:HELLE UND SAUBERE RÖNTGENQUELLE FÜR RÖNTGENBASIERTE METROLOGIE[2020/21]
English:BRIGHT AND CLEAN X-RAY SOURCE FOR X-RAY BASED METROLOGY[2020/21]
French:SOURCE DE RAYONS X LUMINEUSE ET PROPRE POUR MÉTROLOGIE À BASE DE RAYONS X[2020/21]
Entry into regional phase13.02.2020National basic fee paid 
13.02.2020Search fee paid 
13.02.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.2020Examination requested  [2020/21]
12.01.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]WO0232197  (JETTEC AB [SE], et al) [I] 1,4,7 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, lines 1-8 * * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 14 * * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 24 * * page 10, line 12 - page 13, line 34 *;
 [A]US2012050706  (LEVESQUE RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 2 * figures 1-10 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0012] , [0013] , [0030] - [0032] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0045] , [0046] , [0049] *;
 [A]US2017131129  (AHR BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-24 * * the whole document *;
 [YA]US2017142817  (KURITSYN ALEXEY [US], et al) [Y] 4-6 * figures 1-28 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0047] , [0092] , [0095] *[A] 2;
 [XYI]  - PAPP DANIEL ET AL, "A Proposed 100-kHz fs Laser Plasma Hard X-Ray Source at the ELI-ALPS Facility", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PLASMA SCIENCE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 44, no. 10, doi:10.1109/TPS.2016.2606761, ISSN 0093-3813, (20161001), pages 2382 - 2392, (20161007), XP011625097 [X] 1-3,7 * the whole document * [Y] 4-6 [I] 8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPS.2016.2606761
International search[Y]US2014048099  (PARTLO WILLIAM N [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0013], [0029]-[0039], [0042]-[0052], [0061]-[0067], [0084], [0091]; and figures 1-2B. *;
 [Y]US2015285749  (MONCTON DAVID EUGENE [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0019], [0064]-[0067]; claims 2, 6; and figure 11. *;
 [Y]US2016268120  (BEZEL ILYA [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraph [0038]; claims 26, 39; and figure 3A. *;
 [A]JP6121414B  (GIGAPHOTON INC.) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0013]-[0045]; and figures 1-4. *;
 [Y]US2017142817  (KURITSYN ALEXEY [US], et al) [Y] 3, 6-8, 18, 20 * See paragraphs [0095]-[0098], [0104]; and figures 1, 9. *
by applicantUS7929667
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.