EP3683246 - CURED SILICONE ELASTOMER HAVING RADICAL REACTIVITY AND USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Co., Ltd. 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUI, Hiroshi c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | 02 /
TOYAMA, Kyoko c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | 03 /
AKASAKA, Masayasu c/o Dow Corning Toray Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 18853046.3 | 06.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018JP33098 | Priority number, date | JP20170173713 | 11.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017173713 | [2020/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019049950 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683246 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08F299/08, B32B7/12, B32B27/00, B32B27/26, C08J5/18, C08L83/05, C08L83/07, C09J7/38, C09J183/05, C09J183/07, H01L21/52 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
H01L21/6836 (EP);
C08L83/04 (KR,US);
B32B27/283 (KR,US);
B32B37/12 (US);
B32B37/182 (US);
B32B38/10 (US);
B32B7/06 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
C08F299/08 (EP);
C08G77/12 (EP,KR);
C08G77/20 (EP,KR);
C08J5/18 (KR,US);
C08K5/0025 (KR);
C08K5/14 (KR);
C08K5/5415 (KR);
C09J183/04 (KR);
C09J7/25 (KR);
C09J7/29 (US);
C09J7/38 (KR);
H01L21/52 (KR);
B32B2457/00 (US);
C08J2383/04 (US);
C08L2205/025 (KR,US);
C08L2205/035 (US);
C09J2483/00 (US);
H01L2221/68318 (EP);
H01L2221/68327 (EP);
H01L2221/68381 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00, C08L83/00, C08K5/56, C08K5/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | GEHÄRTETES SILIKONELASTOMER MIT RADIKALISCHER REAKTIVITÄT UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2020/30] | English: | CURED SILICONE ELASTOMER HAVING RADICAL REACTIVITY AND USE OF SAME | [2020/30] | French: | ÉLASTOMÈRE DE SILICONE DURCI DOUÉ DE RÉACTIVITÉ EN PRÉSENCE DE RADICAUX ET SON UTILISATION | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2020 | Translation filed | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2016103654 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5 * table 1 * * example 5 *; | [X]US2017355804 (FUJISAWA TOYOHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 * table 1 ** example 5 *; | [X]EP3517577 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * table 1 * * examples 1-7 * * paragraphs [0079] , [0085] , [0089] - [0103] - [0120] *; | [X]EP3517292 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * table 1 * * examples 1-7 * * paragraphs [0042] - [0061] - [0094] - [0097] * | International search | [A]JP2006274154 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * , description & US 2009/0253846 A1, description & WO 2006/107003 A1 & EP 1863877 A1 & KR 10-2007-0116051 A & CN 101151326 A & TW 200643105 A *; | [A]JP2006335926 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-18 * , description & US 2006/0276584 A1, description & KR 10-2006-0126384 A *; | [A]JP2015129213 (MOMENTIVE PERFORMANCE MAT INC) [A] 1-18 * , description (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2015155950 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * , description & US 2017/0121462 A1, description & EP 3130643 A1 & KR 10-2016-0143782 A & CN 106414612 A & TW 201609978 A *; | [A]JP2015199851 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * , description (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2017508852 (DOW CORNING CORPORATION) [A] 1-18 * , description & US 2017/0002159 A1, description & WO 2015/147921 A1 & EP 3122807 A1 & CN 105916924 A & KR 10-2016-0138030 A *; | [PA]WO2018056297 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-18* , description (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS59204259 | JPS6148945 | JPS62104145 | JP2003213132 | JP3865638B | JP2007191629 | JP4628270B | JP2011153249 | JP2012017458 | JP5594232B | JP5794229B | WO2015155950 | JP2016124967 |