EP3683217 - HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND AND ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING ELEMENT COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LT Materials Co., Ltd. 113-19 Dangha-ro Namsa-myeon Cheoin-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Geon-Yu 101 25 Gwoldong-ro 69beonseo-gil Osan-si Gyeonggi-do 18120 / KR | 02 /
NO, Young-Seok 504 98 Gwollisa-ro Osan-si Gyeonggi-do 18120 / KR | 03 /
YANG, Seung-Gyu 301 25-10 Sucheong-ro 50beon-gil Osan-si Gyeonggi-do 18110 / KR | 04 /
CHA, Ju-Hyon 403 28 Osan-ro 226beon-gil Osan-si Gyeonggi-do 18138 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Dong-Jun 113-19 Dangha-ro Namsa-myeon Cheoin-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17118 / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Dae-Hyuk 703-1302 126 Heungdeok 2-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16953 / KR | 07 /
LEE, Joo-Dong 207-1003 7 Dolma-ro 486beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13586 / KR | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18856665.7 | 17.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018KR10936 | Priority number, date | KR20170118675 | 15.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170118675 | [2020/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019054833 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683217 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/04, C07D405/14, C07D409/14, C09K11/06, H01L51/00, H01L51/50 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP,KR);
H10K85/654 (EP,KR,US);
C07D209/86 (EP,US);
C07D405/10 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/04 (EP);
C07D409/14 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR);
H10K50/12 (KR);
H10K50/14 (KR);
H10K50/17 (KR);
H10K85/615 (EP);
H10K85/622 (EP);
H10K85/6572 (EP,US);
H10K85/6574 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/6576 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2211/1088 (KR);
H10K2101/10 (EP);
H10K2101/30 (US);
H10K2101/40 (US);
H10K2101/90 (EP);
H10K2102/351 (US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K50/16 (US);
H10K50/171 (US);
H10K50/18 (US);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K71/164 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNG UND ORGANISCHES LICHTEMITTIERENDES ELEMENT DAMIT | [2020/30] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND AND ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING ELEMENT COMPRISING SAME | [2020/30] | French: | COMPOSÉ HÉTÉROCYCLIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2020 | Translation filed | 13.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 04.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20150031396 (CS ELSOLAR CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7; compound 22 ** claim 1 *; | [X]WO2015051869 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * Both products; page 106 * * claim 1 *; | [X]WO2016129672 (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * Compounds of formula L3; page 38 * * page 107; compounds 600-607 * * claim 1 *; | [X]JP2017107992 (KONICA MINOLTA INC) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * Compounds of formulae 1-7, 1-9, 1-10, 1-11, 1-12 and 1-15; page 13 * * page 16; compounds 47-53, 65-92, 114-119 * * claim 1 * | International search | [X]KR20120104246 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-17 * See abstract; paragraphs [0102], [0119], [0185], [0191], [0260], [0266]; and claims 1, 15, 16. *; | [X]KR20150088176 (UNIVERSAL DISPLAY CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * See compounds 40, 41; and claims 1-20. *; | [X]KR20150126756 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-17 * See abstract; pages 45, 46; and claims 1-20. *; | [X]JP2017107992 (KONICA MINOLTA INC) [X] 1-15 * See abstract; and paragraphs [0014], [0068], [0072]; and claims 1-12. *; | [X]KR20170102000 (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]) [X] 1-15 * See compound 544 of page 101; and claims 1-10. *; | [PX]KR101857632B (DUK SAN NEOLUX CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1-17 * See claims 1-26. *; | [E]WO2018174682 (HEESUNG MAT LTD [KR]) [E] 1-15* See claims 1-12. * | by applicant | US4356429 | KR20170118675 | - Advanced Material, (19940000), vol. 6, page 677 |