EP3685906 - DESULFURIZATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | [2022/36] |
Former [2020/48] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Power, Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama 220-8401 / JP | ||
Former [2020/31] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Hitachi Power Systems, Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGITA, Satoru C/O MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS LTD. 3-1 Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | 02 /
USHIKU, Tetsu C/O MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS LTD. 3-1 Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | 03 /
SASAKI, Ryozo C/O MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS LTD. 3-1 Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIZUMI, Naoyuki C/O MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS LTD. 3-1 Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | 05 /
MIYACHI, Tsuyoshi C/O MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYSTEMS LTD. 3-1 Minatomirai 3-chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | 06 /
KAGAWA, Seiji C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 18859520.1 | 18.09.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018JP34496 | Priority number, date | JP20170180339 | 20.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017180339 | [2020/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019059181 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3685906 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/50, B01D53/18, B01D53/78, B05B1/20, F16B5/02 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
B01D53/504 (EP,US);
B01D53/50 (KR);
B01D47/06 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/18 (KR,US);
B01D53/505 (US);
B01D53/78 (KR,US);
B05B1/20 (EP,KR);
B01D2247/04 (EP);
B01D2247/08 (EP);
B01D2247/107 (EP);
B01D2251/404 (EP);
B01D2252/1035 (EP);
B01D2257/302 (EP);
B01D2257/304 (EP);
B01D2258/0283 (US);
F16B5/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/31] | B01D53/50, B01D53/18, B01D53/78, B05B1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Title | German: | ENTSCHWEFELUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/31] | English: | DESULFURIZATION DEVICE | [2020/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉSULFURATION | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2019 | Translation filed | 25.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 20.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19757438 (RAG AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,9 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0010] - [0019] - [0025]; figures 1-6 * [I] 5-8; | [A]US2010068111 (WALSH JR WILLIAM ARTHUR [US]) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0003] , [0036] , [0046] , [0048]; figures 1,5 *; | [A]CN102225308 (SINOFINN ELECTRIC ENGINEERING CORP, et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]CN202666682U (CHEN YUANZHI) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH01184023 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [A] 1-8* , claims, examples, fig. 1, 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH11104449 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [A] 1-8 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0021]-[0022], fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2012005978 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-4, 6-7, 9-10 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0029], [0051], fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2012179533 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-4, 6-7, 9-10 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0021], [0032], fig. 3, 4 (Family: none) * [A] 5, 8 | by applicant | JPH09225256 | US6613133 |