blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3699232

EP3699232 - RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.10.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.07.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
[2024/04]
Former [2020/35]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Engineering-Plastics Corporation
9-2, Higashi-shinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0021 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SANO, Mayu
c/o MITSUBISHI ENGINEERING-PLASTICS CORPORATION
6-2
Higashiyawata 5-chome
Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP
02 / TAJIMA, Hiroyuki
c/o MITSUBISHI ENGINEERING-PLASTICS CORPORATION
6-2
Higashiyawata 5-chome
Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP
03 / NAKAMURA, Takeshi
c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION
1-1
Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
04 / MONDEN, Toshiki
c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION
1-1
Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
 [2020/35]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[2020/35]
Application number, filing date18868305.615.10.2018
[2020/35]
WO2018JP38336
Priority number, dateJP2017020081417.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017200814
[2020/35]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019078162
Date:25.04.2019
Language:JA
[2019/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3699232
Date:26.08.2020
Language:EN
[2020/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3699232
Date:03.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.04.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2021
ClassificationIPC:C08L69/00, C08K5/101, C08K5/10
[2021/30]
CPC:
C08K5/101 (EP); C08K3/013 (EP); C08K5/11 (EP);
C08K5/12 (EP); C08L69/00 (EP); C08K2201/019 (EP)
C-Set:
C08K3/013, C08L69/00 (EP);
C08K5/101, C08L69/00 (EP);
C08K5/11, C08L69/00 (EP);
C08K5/12, C08L69/00 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08K5/101, C08L69/00 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08K5/10, C08L69/00 (EP)
(-)
Former IPC [2020/35]C08L69/00, C08K5/101
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMARTIKEL[2020/35]
English:RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED ARTICLE[2020/35]
French:COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ET ARTICLE MOULÉ[2020/35]
Entry into regional phase18.03.2020Translation filed 
18.03.2020National basic fee paid 
18.03.2020Search fee paid 
18.03.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.2020Examination requested  [2020/35]
12.01.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2024Fee for grant paid
27.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
15.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2014228767  (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0059] - [0062] - [0072] - [0080] - [0116]; examples 9,10,11; table 2 *;
 [XDI]JP2016216534  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO, et al) [XD] 1-5,9-11 * Comparative examples 1,3; paragraphs [0044] - [0052] - [0083]; table 4 *[I] 6-8
International search[A]JP2004059744  (NOF CORP) [A] 1-11* , claims, examples (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2010270221  (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP) [A] 1-11 * , claims, paragraphs [0002], [0005], [0010], [0036]-[0043], [0086]-[0090], examples (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2013064045  (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-11 * , claims, paragraphs [0003], [0011], [0044], [0060]-[0064], examples (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2014228767  (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-11 * , claims, paragraphs [0035], [0057]-[0060], [0063], [0070]-[0075], [0078], example 9 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2016153442  (DAICEL POLYMER LTD) [A] 1-11 * , claims, paragraphs [0002], [0015]-[0017], examples (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2006199774
 JP2010116501
 JP2011046769
 WO2013094898
 WO2014038500
 JP2016216534
 WO2017099226
 JP2017110180
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.