blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3701379

EP3701379 - SWIZZLING IN 3D STACKED MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.12.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.07.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
2485 Augustine Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2020/36]
Inventor(s)01 / WUU, John
2485 Augustine Drive
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
02 / CIRAULA, Michael K.
2485 Augustine Drive
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
03 / SCHREIBER, Russell
2485 Augustine Drive
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
04 / NAFFZIGER, Samuel
2485 Augustine Drive
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
 [2020/36]
Representative(s)Hancox, Jonathan Christopher
Venner Shipley LLP
Windsor House
6-10 Mount Ephraim Road
Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2020/36]Brookes IP
Windsor House
6-10 Mount Ephraim Road
Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB
Application number, filing date18871285.518.09.2018
[2020/36]
WO2018US51592
Priority number, dateUS20171579445726.10.2017         Original published format: US201715794457
[2020/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019083642
Date:02.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3701379
Date:02.09.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR02.05.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2021
ClassificationIPC:G06F12/02, G06F12/06, G06F3/06, G06F12/14
[2021/32]
CPC:
G06F3/061 (EP); G06F12/023 (KR); G06F3/0659 (EP,US);
G06F12/0284 (EP,US); G06F12/0607 (EP); G06F12/0646 (KR);
G06F12/1009 (US); G06F3/0611 (US); G06F3/0613 (US);
G06F3/064 (EP); G06F3/0658 (KR); G06F3/0673 (US);
G06F3/0688 (EP); G06F12/0292 (EP,US); G06F12/1408 (EP,US);
G06F2212/1016 (EP,US); G06F2212/1032 (EP); G06F2212/202 (US);
G06F2212/2532 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/36]G06F12/02, G06F12/06, G06F3/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/36]
TitleGerman:SWIZZLING IN EINEM GESTAPELTEN 3D-SPEICHER[2020/36]
English:SWIZZLING IN 3D STACKED MEMORY[2020/36]
French:BASCULEMENT DANS UNE MÉMOIRE 3D EMPILÉE[2020/36]
Entry into regional phase29.04.2020National basic fee paid 
29.04.2020Search fee paid 
29.04.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.2020Examination requested  [2020/36]
11.02.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0540198  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 8, line 6 - line 51 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5924111  (HUANG CHU-KAI [TW], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 7, line 17 - page 10, line 62 * * figures 6-8 *;
 [Y]US2002040429  (DOWLING ERIC M [US]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0048] * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2011157200  (HUR JAE YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0082] ** figure - *;
 [A]US2014241099  (SEO SEONG-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0068] * * figure - *;
 [Y]US2016041856  (SANKARALINGAM KARTHIKEYAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0036] * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]  - LIN SHU-YEN ET AL, "Thermal- and Performance-Aware Address Mapping for the Multi-Channel Three-Dimensional DRAM Systems", IEEE ACCESS, (20170517), vol. 5, doi:10.1109/ACCESS.2017.2690323, pages 5566 - 5577, XP011649282 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 5566, column ri, line 3 - page 5574, column le, line 31 * * figure - *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACCESS.2017.2690323
International search[A]US2008079744  (XU JIM [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0036]; and figures 4-5. *;
 [A]US2008101104  (IKEDA HIROAKI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0049]-[0054], [0079]-[0084]; and figures 3A, 9-10B. *;
 [A]US2008120514  (ISMAIL YEHEA [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0070]-[0072]; and figures 7A-7B. *;
 [A]US2012099389  (PARK CHUL-WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0060]-[0062], [0149]-[0152]; claims 22-23; and figures 4, 17. *;
 [X]US2016148910  (IDE AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0005], [0029]-[0030], [0061], [0065]; claim 1; and figures 1, 10-11, 13. *
by applicantUS2002040429
 US2016041856
    - LIN SHU-YEN, "Thermal- and Performance-Aware Address Mapping for the MultiChannel Three-Dimensional DRAM Systems", IEEE ACCESS, vol. 5, doi:10.1109/ACCESS.2017.2690323, pages 5566 - 5577, XP011649282

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACCESS.2017.2690323
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.