Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3547187

EP3547187 - FINGERPRINT LOGIN METHOD, MICRO-CONTROL UNIT, FINGERPRINT POWER SUPPLY ASSEMBLY, AND ELECTRONIC TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.08.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shenzhen Goodix Technology Co., Ltd.
Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building
Futian Free Trade Zone
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN
[2019/40]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Ruifeng
Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building
Futian Free Trade Zone
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN
02 / WANG, Bing
Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building
Futian Free Trade Zone
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN
03 / SUN, Wenbin
Floor 13, Phase B, Tengfei Industrial Building
Futian Free Trade Zone
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518045 / CN
 [2019/40]
Representative(s)Sticht, Andreas
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[2019/40]
Application number, filing date18875019.401.02.2018
[2019/40]
WO2018CN74921
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2019148413
Date:08.08.2019
Language:ZH
[2019/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3547187
Date:02.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN08.08.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/32
[2019/51]
Former International [2019/40]G06F21/32, G06F1/32, G06K9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FINGERABDRUCK-LOGIN-VERFAHREN, MIKROSTEUERUNGSEINHEIT, FINGERABDRUCKSTROMVERSORGUNGSANORDNUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHES ENDGERÄT[2019/40]
English:FINGERPRINT LOGIN METHOD, MICRO-CONTROL UNIT, FINGERPRINT POWER SUPPLY ASSEMBLY, AND ELECTRONIC TERMINAL[2019/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CONNEXION PAR EMPREINTE DIGITALE, UNITÉ DE MICRO-COMMANDE, ENSEMBLE D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE PAR EMPREINTE DIGITALE ET TERMINAL ÉLECTRONIQUE[2019/40]
Entry into regional phase16.05.2019Translation filed 
16.05.2019National basic fee paid 
16.05.2019Search fee paid 
16.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/40]
Cited inInternational search[Y]CN107153781  (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [Y] 1-2, 9, 12-13, 20, 23-25 * description, paragraphs 0041-0154 *;
 [Y]CN105743648  (AISINO CORP INC) [Y] 1-2, 9, 12-13, 20, 23-25 * description, paragraphs 0063-0147 *;
 [A]CN107454955  (SHEN ZHEN HUIDING TECH LTD) [A] 1-25 * entire document *;
 [A]CN104573575  (XIAMEN MEITU MOBILE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * entire document *