blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3710092

EP3710092 - FABRIC AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.05.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.08.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024New entry: Observations by third parties 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AUT Ventures Limited
16th floor, WO Building
58 Wakefield Street
Auckland / NZ
[2020/39]
Inventor(s)01 / AL-JUMAILY, Ahmed
97 Polo Prince Drive
Totara Park Auckland 2576 / NZ
02 / BARTUAL, Sandra Grau
100 ANZAC-Apartment 10C
Auckland 1010 / NZ
 [2020/39]
Representative(s)Secerna LLP
The Old Fire Station
18 Clifford Street
York YO1 9RD / GB
[2020/39]
Application number, filing date18877110.913.11.2018
[2020/39]
WO2018NZ50161
Priority number, dateNZ1773726913.11.2017         Original published format: NZ 17737269
[2020/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019093910
Date:16.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3710092
Date:23.09.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU16.05.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61M16/10, C08F251/02, C08F220/56, C08F2/10
[2020/39]
CPC:
C08F120/54 (EP); C08F251/02 (EP,AU,US); A61M16/1045 (EP,AU,US);
A61M16/022 (AU,US); A61M16/06 (EP,US); A61M16/109 (EP);
C08F2/38 (EP); A61M11/042 (EP); A61M16/161 (EP);
A61M2016/0024 (EP,US); A61M2205/3368 (EP,AU,US); A61M2205/36 (US);
A61M2205/3653 (AU); A61M2205/8206 (EP,US); A61M2207/00 (EP);
C08F2/10 (AU); C08F220/56 (AU); C08F2438/01 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
C08F251/02, C08F220/54 (EP);
C08F251/02, C08F220/56 (AU)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/39]
TitleGerman:STOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG[2020/39]
English:FABRIC AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING[2020/39]
French:TOILE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRIQUER[2020/39]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2020National basic fee paid 
12.06.2020Search fee paid 
12.06.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2019Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
12.06.2020Examination requested  [2020/39]
22.07.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2024Observations by third parties
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2016250438  (HARWOOD JONATHAN DAVID [NZ], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0244]; figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US2017282120  (URAMOTO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraphs [0011] , [0041] , [0042] , [0048] , [0051] *
International search[A]US6330883  (BERGER RICHARD M [US]);
 [A]US2004099268  (SMITH DANIEL JOHN [NZ], et al);
 [A]WO2015051126  (ELWHA LLC [US]);
 [A]US2016250438  (HARWOOD JONATHAN DAVID [NZ], et al);
 [A]US2017172227  (FAN JINTU [US], et al);
 [X]US2017282120  (URAMOTO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract, [0011], [0041], [0070] *
by applicantUS2016250438
 US2017282120
otherUS2012157794
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.