EP3605935 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUAN, Peng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, You Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Roth, Sebastian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | Roth, Sebastian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2020/06] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18879587.6 | 15.11.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018CN115602 | Priority number, date | CN201711147082 | 17.11.2017 Original published format: CN201711147082 | CN201810480678 | 18.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810480678 | [2020/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019096195 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3605935 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3605935 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
H04L5/0023 (EP,US);
H04B7/0408 (CN);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04B7/0626 (CN);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04B7/088 (EP);
H04L1/0026 (US);
H04L27/2602 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0007 (US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/005 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (CN);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04W72/046 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2020/06] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2020/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2019 | Translation filed | 23.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 17.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22177423.5 / EP4117216 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2018 | AL | 22.06.2022 | AT | 22.06.2022 | BG | 22.06.2022 | CY | 22.06.2022 | CZ | 22.06.2022 | DK | 22.06.2022 | EE | 22.06.2022 | ES | 22.06.2022 | FI | 22.06.2022 | HR | 22.06.2022 | IT | 22.06.2022 | LT | 22.06.2022 | LV | 22.06.2022 | MC | 22.06.2022 | MK | 22.06.2022 | MT | 22.06.2022 | NL | 22.06.2022 | PL | 22.06.2022 | RO | 22.06.2022 | RS | 22.06.2022 | SE | 22.06.2022 | SI | 22.06.2022 | SK | 22.06.2022 | SM | 22.06.2022 | NO | 22.09.2022 | GR | 23.09.2022 | IS | 22.10.2022 | PT | 24.10.2022 | IE | 15.11.2022 | LU | 15.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/44] | HU | 15.11.2018 | |
AL | 22.06.2022 | ||
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CY | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
MK | 22.06.2022 | ||
MT | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 15.11.2018 | |
AL | 22.06.2022 | ||
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CY | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
MK | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 15.11.2018 | |
AL | 22.06.2022 | ||
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CY | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.11.2018 | |
AL | 22.06.2022 | ||
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
IT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
IE | 15.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SI | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
LU | 15.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
MC | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
DK | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 22.06.2022 | |
AT | 22.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
IS | 22.10.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
PL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
CZ | 22.06.2022 | ||
EE | 22.06.2022 | ||
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RO | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
SK | 22.06.2022 | ||
SM | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
PT | 24.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
ES | 22.06.2022 | ||
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 22.06.2022 | |
FI | 22.06.2022 | ||
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
NL | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
RS | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
HR | 22.06.2022 | ||
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
LV | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
BG | 22.09.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | ||
GR | 23.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 22.06.2022 | |
LT | 22.06.2022 | ||
SE | 22.06.2022 | ||
NO | 22.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3471328 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [E] 1,4,6,9,11-15 * paragraph [0256] - paragraph [0260] *; | [E]WO2019215328 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [E] 1-3,6-8,11-15 * paragraph [0038] *; | [XA] - ZTE ET AL, "On CSI-RS for CSI acquisition and beam management", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, CZ; 20171009 - 20171013, (20171008), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1717432 ON CSI-RS FOR CSI ACQUISITION AND BEAM MANAGEMENT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20171008), XP051340621 [X] 1,4,6,9,11-15 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,5,7,8,10 | [XP] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Feature lead summary 1 of the remaining issues for RS multiplexing", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180227), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1803293 FEATURE LEAD SUMMARY 1 OF THE REMAINING ISSUES FOR RS MULTIPLEXING-UPDATE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-0692, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F92/Docs/, (20180227), XP051398459 [XP] 1,2,6,7,11-15 * the whole document * |