blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3714332

EP3714332 - TONER FOR DEVELOPING ELECTROSTATIC LATENT IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.08.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2024Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.06.2024 [2024/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
10300 Energy Drive
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2020/40]
Inventor(s)01 / YOON, Se Young
1406-2101, 19, Dongtandaerosibeom-gil
Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18477 / KR
02 / SHIN, Yo Da
103-1401, 21, Jeongjacheon-ro 188beon-gil,
Jangan-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16315 / KR
03 / JUNG, Woo Chul
102-703, 32, Taejang-ro 82beon-gil,
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16687 / KR
 [2020/40]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2020/40]Walaski, Jan Filip, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date18904120.526.07.2018
[2020/40]
WO2018KR08449
Priority number, dateKR2018001361802.02.2018         Original published format: KR 20180013618
[2020/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019151592
Date:08.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3714332
Date:30.09.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.08.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.2021
ClassificationIPC:G03G9/097, G03G9/08
[2021/31]
CPC:
G03G9/0819 (EP,US); G03G9/0935 (KR); G03G9/09708 (EP,US);
G03G15/0808 (KR); G03G15/0889 (KR,US); G03G9/0821 (EP);
G03G9/087 (KR); G03G9/08797 (KR); G03G9/09 (KR);
G03G9/09307 (KR); G03G9/09716 (EP); G03G9/09725 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/40]G03G9/093, G03G9/087, G03G9/09, G03G15/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/40]
TitleGerman:TONER ZUM ENTWICKELN EINES ELEKTROSTATISCHEN LATENTEN BILDES[2020/40]
English:TONER FOR DEVELOPING ELECTROSTATIC LATENT IMAGE[2020/40]
French:TONER POUR DÉVELOPPER UNE IMAGE LATENTE ÉLECTROSTATIQUE[2020/40]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2020National basic fee paid 
26.06.2020Search fee paid 
26.06.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2020Examination requested  [2020/40]
27.08.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2024Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2024/25]
21.02.2024Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2024/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.202306   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP2341395  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 5-14 * paragraphs [0101] , [0114] , [0117]; figure 2; example 1 * [A] 1-4;
 [XA]WO2013115413  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 5-14 * paragraphs [0030] , [0047]; example 1 * * fig.4, reference sign 140;; claim 1 * [A] 1-4;
 [XA]EP2767871  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 5-14 * paragraphs [0016] , [0018] , [0037] - [0039] * * paragraph [0084]; example 1 * * paragraph [0087]; figure 7 *[A] 1-4
International search[A]US2008056786  (ISHINO MASAHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]US2011159427  (KANG KYUNG-YEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0093], [0102], [0106]; claims 1-11. *;
 [A]US2013236824  (YOON SE-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]US2014234766  (YOON SE-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0023], [0082]; claims 1-6. *;
 [A]US2017131648  (YOON SE-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-14* See the whole document. *
by applicantEP2341395
 WO2013115413
 EP2767871
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.