blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3702261

EP3702261 - SEAWATER CIRCULATION SYSTEM FOR SHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.07.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.07.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2023(Expected) grantpublished on 10.01.2024  [2024/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seo, Min Su
821ho, Gangnam Purjiocity 2 cha 192, Jagok-ro
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 06373 / KR
[2020/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2020/36]
Representative(s)Müller Verweyen
Patentanwälte
Friedensallee 290
22763 Hamburg / DE
[2020/36]
Application number, filing date18906664.026.11.2018
[2020/36]
WO2018KR14601
Priority number, dateKR2018001923519.02.2018         Original published format: KR 20180019235
[2020/36]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019160224
Date:22.08.2019
Language:KO
[2019/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3702261
Date:02.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3702261
Date:10.01.2024
Language:EN
[2024/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.08.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2021
ClassificationIPC:B63B13/00, B63J2/12, F01N3/08, F01N3/04, F01N13/00, // B63J2/00
[2021/33]
CPC:
F01N13/004 (EP); B63B13/00 (KR); B63J2/12 (EP,KR);
F01N3/04 (EP); F01N3/085 (KR); B63B2013/005 (EP);
B63J2002/005 (EP); F01N2570/04 (EP); F01N2590/02 (EP);
F01P2050/04 (EP); Y02T10/12 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/36]B63B13/00, B63J2/12, F01N3/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SEEWASSERZIRKULATIONSSYSTEM FÜR EIN SCHIFF[2020/36]
English:SEAWATER CIRCULATION SYSTEM FOR SHIP[2020/36]
French:SYSTÈME DE CIRCULATION D'EAU DE MER POUR NAVIRE[2020/36]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2020Translation filed 
29.05.2020National basic fee paid 
29.05.2020Search fee paid 
29.05.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.05.2020Examination requested  [2020/36]
10.02.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2023Fee for grant paid
04.12.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.12.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
11.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[IY]FR2826931  (WARTSILA TECHNOLOGY OY AB [FI]) [I] 1-4 * figure 1 * [Y] 5;
 [A]US2010206171  (PENG SIGAN [CN]) [A] 1-5* paragraph [0067]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP2574393  (ALFA LAVAL AALBORG AS [DK]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0049]; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2017043722  (SAMSUNG HEAVY IND [KR]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
International search[A]KR20090112296  (SAMSUNG HEAVY IND [KR]) [A] 1-5* [0012]-[0023]; 2 *;
 [A]KR20140009324  (WAERTSILAE FINLAND OY [FI]) [A] 1-5 * [0027]-[0038]; 1 *;
 [A]KR20150075663  (DAEWOO SHIPBUILDING & MARINE [KR]) [A] 1-5 * [0031]-[0033], [0038]-[0039], [0046]; 2 *;
 [A]KR101647462B  [A] 1-5 * [0030]-[0041]; 1 *;
 [A]JP2017019415  (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG) [A] 1-5 * [0014]-[0017]; 1-2 %3':. *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.