EP3764155 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT, NL | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07336 SEOUL / KR | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Myungwhun IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Donghyun IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Yanghyun IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
SHIN, Jonggon IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 05 /
JANG, Munseok IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Sangho IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 07 /
HAN, Jinkyo IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil, Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/02] | Application number, filing date | 18909078.0 | 10.05.2018 | [2021/02] | WO2018KR05395 | Priority number, date | KR20180027046 | 07.03.2018 Original published format: KR 20180027046 | [2021/02] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019172483 | Date: | 12.09.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764155 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3764155 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.09.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335, G02F1/1333, G02F1/13357 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
G02F1/133608 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133308 (KR);
G02F1/133603 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133605 (EP,KR,US);
G02F2201/465 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | G02F1/1335, G02F1/1333 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2021/02] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2021/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2021/02] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2020 | Translation filed | 25.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 24.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007103908 (TABITO HAFUKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,6-10 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0122] *; | [Y]EP2343478 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 3-5* paragraphs [0009] - [0066]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2012033015 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,6-10 * paragraphs [0052] - [0122]; figures 2,3,6 *; | [Y]WO2012063676 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP2458263 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0022] - [0079]; figures 1-9 *; | [Y]EP2930556 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,10 * paragraphs [0035] - [0103]; figures 5-14 *; | [Y]EP3115838 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1,2,10 * paragraphs [0074] - [0167]; figures 3-10 * | International search | [Y]JP2007322697 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0017], [0022], [0024], [0038]-[0042], [0059]; and figures 2, 8-9. *; | [Y]KR20080043567 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraph [0059]; and figures 3-4. *; | [Y]JP2010218915 (SHARP KK) [Y] 3-9 * See paragraphs [0059], [0068]; and figures 9, 14. *; | [A]KR20150065318 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See claims 1-2: and figure 2. *; | [A]KR20160099774 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10* See claim 1; and figures 3-4. * |