blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3720023

EP3720023 - POLAR CODE DECODING METHOD AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.08.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.08.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.04.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.09.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 07.02.2024  [2024/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2020/41]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Bin
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / LIU, Ling
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / SHEN, Hui
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / GU, Jiaqi
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2020/41]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2020/41]
Application number, filing date18915137.629.12.2018
[2020/41]
WO2018CN125870
Priority number, dateCN20181034812518.04.2018         Original published format: CN201810348125
[2020/41]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019200971
Date:24.10.2019
Language:ZH
[2019/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3720023
Date:07.10.2020
Language:EN
[2020/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3720023
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN24.10.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2021
ClassificationIPC:H03M13/13, H03M13/29, H03M13/37, H03M13/45, H04L1/00
[2021/12]
CPC:
H03M13/3746 (EP); H03M13/13 (EP,CN); H03M13/29 (EP);
H03M13/3776 (EP); H03M13/45 (EP); H04L1/0036 (CN);
H04L1/005 (EP); H04L1/0057 (EP,CN); H04L1/0065 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/41]H04L1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND DECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR POLARCODES[2020/41]
English:POLAR CODE DECODING METHOD AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE[2020/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE DE CODE POLAIRE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION[2020/41]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2020Translation filed 
02.07.2020National basic fee paid 
02.07.2020Search fee paid 
02.07.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2020Examination requested  [2020/41]
28.06.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.04.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2023Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.08.2023Fee for grant paid
07.08.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.09.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAI]  - LIU ZHENZHEN ET AL, "Parallel concatenated systematic polar code based on soft successive cancellation list decoding", 2017 20TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON WIRELESS PERSONAL MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATIONS (WPMC), IEEE, (20171217), doi:10.1109/WPMC.2017.8301804, pages 181 - 184, XP033326136 [X] 1 * Section III.B * [A] 4-9 [I] 2,3,10-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WPMC.2017.8301804
 [A]  - KOIKE-AKINO TOSHIAKI ET AL, "Irregular Polar Turbo Product Coding for High-Throughput Optical Interface", 2018 OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION (OFC), OSA, (20180311), pages 1 - 3, XP033357478 [A] 1-15 * section 2, figure 1 *
Examination   - FAYYAZ UBAID U ET AL, "Low-Complexity Soft-Output Decoding of Polar Codes", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, vol. 32, no. 5, doi:10.1109/JSAC.2014.140515, ISSN 0733-8716, (20140501), pages 958 - 966, (20140423), XP011546180

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSAC.2014.140515
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.